Case Information: 89-AA-0026 | |||
Short Caption: | TENANTS OF MINNESOTA GARDEN V. RENTAL HOUSING COMMISSION | Classification: | Agency - Administrative Agency - Rental Housing Commission |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | Filed Date: | 01/17/1989 | |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 01/17/1989 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 02/03/1989 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | |||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 03/26/1990 |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Intervenor-Respondent | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Petitioner | Tenants of Minnesota Garden | N | |||||||
Respondent | D.C. Rental Housing Commission | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | TENANTS OF MINNESOTA GARDEN INC. D.C. RENTAL HOUSING COMMISSION | |||
01/17/1989 | $50.00 DOCKETING FEE MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
01/17/1989 | PETITION FOR REVIEW MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
01/18/1989 | CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD & CHARLES L. REISCHEL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
01/23/1989 | $5 PAID TO DC TREASURER PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
02/03/1989 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
02/03/1989 | ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
02/03/1989 | RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 020789 SCHPRD R | |||
02/07/1989 | ORDER DIRG PTNR TO FILE DSA W/IN 10 DAYS OR APPEAL SHALL STAND DISMISSED. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
02/15/1989 | PETITIONER'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 021889 SCHPRD DSA | |||
02/17/1989 | NOTICE OF INTENT TO INTERVENE OF MINNESOTA GARDENS ON BEHALF APPELLEE'S GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
03/24/1989 | ORDER DIRG PTNR, W/IN 20 DAYS, TO FILE BRIEF OR CASE SHALL STAND DISMISSED FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
04/13/1989 | PETITIONER'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 4/17/89 GT PANEL SCDATE 041489 SCHPRD BA | |||
04/18/1989 | PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
04/18/1989 | RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
05/10/1989 | PETITIONER'S BRIEF MEH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
05/10/1989 | ORDER GRANT MO TO FL PTNR BRF; APLE BRF DUE IN 30 DAYS. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 050389 SCHPRD M | |||
05/18/1989 | INTERVENOR'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF (APPELLEE'S) TO 5-25-89 AD PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
05/18/1989 | STATEMENT IN LIEU OF APPELLEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 060989 SCHPRD BE | |||
05/25/1989 | RECEIVED INTERVENOR'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
06/09/1989 | INTERVENOR'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
10/12/1989 | MEMORANDUM SUBMITTED TO JJ TE/SC/KN PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
03/05/1990 | AFFIRMED JUDGMENT AF DECISION ON REVIEW PANELTESCKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
03/05/1990 | DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -KN CITE 570 A.2d 1194 | |||
03/05/1990 | OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - KN PAGE # - 0577 | |||
03/26/1990 | MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
03/26/1990 | MOTION TO EXT TM TO FILE PET FOR REH/REH EN BANC TO 4-9-90 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
03/30/1990 | INTERVENOR'S OPPOSITION TO APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE PET. FOR REHEAR/REHEAR RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
04/06/1990 | ORDER GRT PETNR'S MO TO FILE PET AND PET FOR REH/REH EB SHALL BE FILED ON OR BEFORE 4/9/90 SL PANELRO SCDATE 032790 SCHPRD N | |||
04/09/1990 | PETITION FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANC APPELLANT'S RJG PANEL SCDATE 040990 SCHPRD MRRB |