judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

COOPER (MICHAEL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 43976
Short Caption:COOPER (MICHAEL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 39608 , 42727 , 44181 , 48971 , 53744
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C177876Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/05/2004How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/21/2004Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/21/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 04-17458
09/23/2004Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order filed 9/21/04. Due Date: 10 days
09/30/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order filed in district court on September 21, 2004. 04-18121
10/22/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 30 days. See NRAP 11(a)(2) (the complete record shall contain each and every paper, pleading and other document filed, or submitted for filing, in the district court, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings.) fn1[The record shall not include any physical, non-documentary exhibits or the original documentary exhibits filed in the district court, but copies of documentary exhibits submitted in the district court proceedings shall be transmitted as part of the record on appeal. The record shall also include any presentence investigation reports submitted in this matter. The clerk of the district court shall transmit the reports to this court in a sealed envelope identifying the contents and marked confidential.] Nos. 43939/ 43976/ 44001/ 44004/ 44006 - cases are not consolidated. 04-19595
11/05/2004Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 and 2. 04-20424
11/05/2004Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
12/14/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Directing Transmission of Supplemental Record on Appeal. The record before this court does not contain the transcript of the district court hearing held on July 30, 2004. If the transcript has been prepared and filed with the district court, the clerk of the district court shall transmit a certified copy to the clerk of this court within 10 days from the date of this order as a supplemental record on appeal. If the transcript has not been prepared and filed below, the district court shall order its prompt preparation. If such an order is required, the clerk of the district court shall have 15 days from the date of this order within which to transmit a copy of the district court's order to the clerk of this court. The clerk of the district court shall then have 10 days from the date the transcript is filed within which to transmit a certified copy to the clerk of this court as a supplemental record on appeal. 04-22775
12/20/2004TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: July 30, 2004. Court Reporter: Angela K. Lee. 04-23195
01/24/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Directing Transmission of Supplemental Record on Appeal. The record before this court does not contain transcripts of the district court hearings held on August 18, 2004, and September 1, 2004, and an affidavit from Cooper's counsel, Kirk Kennedy, labeled Exhibit A to Cooper's motion for appointment of counsel, which was admitted during the August 18, 2004, hearing. If the transcripts have been prepared and filed with the district court, the clerk of the district court shall transmit certified copies to the clerk of this court within 10 days from the date of this order as a supplemental record on appeal. If the transcripts have not been prepared and filed below, the district court shall order their prompt preparation. If such an order is required, the clerk of the district court shall have 15 days from the date of this order within which to transmit a copy of the district court's order to the clerk of this court. The clerk of the district court shall then have 10 days from the date the transcripts are filed within which to transmit certified copies to the clerk of this court as a supplemental record on appeal. Further, the clerk of the district court shall have 10 days from the date of this order to transmit a copy of the affidavit as a supplemental record on appeal. 05-01458
02/17/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court Clerk. Letter from Clark Co. Clerk enclosing Exhibit A--affidavit of Kirk Kennedy; and transcript of 9/1/04 hearing. 05-03223
03/11/2005TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 08/18/04. Court Reporter: Julie Lever. (In response to the order filed 01/24/05.) 05-04939
03/15/2005TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: August 18, 2004. Court Reporter: Julie M. Lever (In response to order filed 1/24/05). 05-05084
04/05/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that Cooper is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn11[We have reviewed Cooper's ex parte motion and conclude that no relief based upon his motion is warranted.] NNP05-WM/MD/RP 05-06644
05/03/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 05-06761
05/03/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/16/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 11, 2005. 05-06761