judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

NORMINGTON (CHARLES) VS. STATE

Case Information: 43983
Short Caption:NORMINGTON (CHARLES) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR022148Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/22/2004Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/22/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 04-17561
10/12/2004TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 6/3/04; 6/8/04; 8/19/04. Court Reporter: Peggy Hoogs & Associates. 04-18913
10/14/2004TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: June 7, 2004. Court Reporter: Cecillia Vohl. 04-19078
10/27/2004Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 04-19838
10/27/2004AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement.
11/17/2004Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 04-21114
03/03/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP05-RR/MG/JH 05-04174
03/29/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 05-04684
03/29/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/07/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on April 1, 2005. 05-04684