Case Information: 89-AA-0057 | |||
Short Caption: | PATRICIA PRICE V. D.C. DEPARTMENT OF EMPLOYMENT | Classification: | Agency - Administrative Agency - Unemployment Compensation |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | Filed Date: | 02/23/1989 | |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 02/23/1989 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | ||
Briefs Completed: | |||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 04/21/1989 |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Petitioner | Patricia Price | N | Pro Se | N | |||||
Respondent | D.C. Department of Employment Services | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | PRICE, PATRICIA D.C. DEPARTMENT OF EMPLOYMENT SERVICE | |||
01/01/1903 | NOTE - 01 3/29/89 ORD: GRT RESPONDENT'S NOTE - 01 MOTION TO DISMISS PET FOR NOTE - 02 REVIEW AND THIS APPEAL IS NOTE - 02 HEREBY DISMISSED FOR FAILURE NOTE - 03 TO EXHAUST ADMINISTRATIVE NOTE - 03 REMEDIES. | |||
01/25/1989 | PETITION FOR REVIEW (FORM 5) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
01/25/1989 | RECEIVED PETITION FOR REVIEW JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
01/25/1989 | RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
02/23/1989 | PETITIONER'S DOCKETING STATEMENT PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
02/23/1989 | ORDER GRT APLT MO TO PROCEED IN FOR- MA PAUPERIS, CLK TO FL LDG DSA AND PETITION FOR REVIEW. PB PANELRO SCDATE 021589 SCHPRD Q | |||
02/23/1989 | PETITION FOR REVIEW PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
03/02/1989 | RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
03/29/1989 | Filed | OUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition | ||
03/29/1989 | ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 1 THRU 3 SL PANELSTSC SCDATE 032389 SCHPRD VS | |||
03/29/1989 | DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -PC CITE | |||
04/21/1989 | MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD |