judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ELIZONDA (ZEFERINO) VS. STATE

Case Information: 43961
Short Caption:ELIZONDA (ZEFERINO) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 41555 , 58511
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C186079Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/17/2004Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/17/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 04-17253
11/15/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP04D-RR/WM/MD 04-20851
12/10/2004RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 04-21217
12/10/2004Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/20/2004RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 13, 2004. 04-21217