judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FUNEZ (JOSE) VS. STATE

Case Information: 43960
Short Caption:FUNEZ (JOSE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 47757
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C186325Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/22/2004How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/17/2004Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/17/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 04-17246
09/27/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 90 days. See NRAP 11(a)(2) (the complete record shall contain each and every paper, pleading and other document filed, or submitted for filing, in the district court, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings.) fn1[The record shall not include any physical, non-documentary exhibits or the original documentary exhibits filed in the district court, but copies of documentary exhibits submitted in the district court proceedings shall be transmitted as part of the record on appeal. The record shall also include any presentence investigation reports submitted in this matter. The clerk of the district court shall transmit the reports to this court in a sealed envelope identifying the contents and marked confidential.] 04-17868
12/22/2004Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 04-23341
12/22/2004Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
02/16/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that Funez is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP05-WM/MD/RP 05-03165
03/15/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 05-03320
03/15/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/23/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 17, 2005. 05-03320