judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

HOOPER, MARIA LISTON NS&T BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Case Information: 87-PR-0038
Short Caption:HOOPER, MARIA LISTON NS&T BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATIONClassification:Appeals - Probate - Probate
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:ADM1973-85Filed Date:01/13/1987

Opening Event Date:01/13/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/06/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Robert J. Strupp NN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Werner Strupp NN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Nicholas A. Sloan NN
AppellantJohn Doe N
David W. Goewey NN
AppellantMaria Elizabeth NPro SeN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Chiswell D. Langhorne NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HOOPER, MARIA LISTON NS&T BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION IN RE EST.: HUNTER H. HOOPER
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 5/1/87 ORD: CLK DIRTD TO FILE NOTE - 01 LODGED APLT'S DKTG STMT AND NOTE - 02 GRANT MO. TO EXTEND TIME FOR NOTE - 02 TRANSMISSION OF RECORD AND TO NOTE - 03 FILE DR/SRT ONLY TO THE EXTENT NOTE - 03 THAT THE DR/SRT SHALL BE FILED NOTE - 04 WITHIN 10 DAYS FROM THE DATE NOTE - 04 OF THIS ORDER. NOTE - 05 6/26/87 ORD: GRANT MO OF NOTE - 05 WERNER STRUPP & ROBERT STRUPP NOTE - 06 TO W/DRAW & ARE VACATED; GRANT NOTE - 06 MO OF APLT'S FOR EXT OF TM TO NOTE - 07 FL LODGED DR, SRT & COUNTER NOTE - 07 DR; BRF OF APLT DUE 40 DAYS NOTE - 08 AFTER COMPLETE RECORD OF FILED NOTE - 08 IN THIS COURT. NOTE - 09 12/21/88 ORD: THE CLK IS DIRTD NOTE - 09 TO FILE THE 11/3/88 LTR FROM NOTE - 10 APLT AS A MO. TO REINSTATE THE NOTE - 10 APPEAL AND TRANSMIT COPY OF MO NOTE - 11 TO APLE FORTHWITH. FO THAT NOTE - 11 APLE MAY RESPOND TO THE MO. TO NOTE - 12 REINSTATE W/I 10 DAYS FROM THE NOTE - 12 DATE OF THIS ORDER. NOTE - 13 3/3/89 ORD: THAT APLT IS DIRTD NOTE - 13 TO SHOW CAUSE W/I 10 DAYS WHY NOTE - 14 THE MOTION TO REINSTATE THE NOTE - 14 APPEAL SHLD NOT BE DENIED IN NOTE - 15 ACCORDANCE WITH APLE'S MOTION NOTE - 15 TO DENY REINSTATEMENT OF NOTE - 16 APPEAL. NOTE - 16 NOTE - 17 4/14/89 ORD: APLT'S RESPONSE NOTE - 17 TO THIS CT'S 3/3/89 ORDER NOTE - 18 SHALL BE FILED ON OR BEFORE NOTE - 18 4/21/89. ANY FURTHER REQUEST NOTE - 19 FOR AN EXT OF TIME WILL BE NOTE - 19 LOOKED UPON W/DISFAVOR AND NOTE - 20 GRANTED ONLY IN EXTRAORDINARY NOTE - 20 CIRCUMSTANCES. NOTE - 21 052689 ORDER: TO RETURN MAND. NOTE - 21 ISS. 12/21/87; FO PARTIES TO NOTE - 22 ADVISE COURT OF STATUS OF SETT NOTE - 22 PROC. W/IN 30 DAYS. MEH
01/01/1906 STRUPPR VACATED 6/26/87. STRUPPW VACATED 6/26/87.
01/13/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
03/11/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR EXT. OF TIME TO FILE DESIGNATION OF RECORD & STMT RE TRANS. RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/11/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR EXT. OF TIME FOR TRANSMISSION OF REC. TO 5/4/87 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/17/1987MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR TRANSMISSION OF THE RECORD TO 5/4/87 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/17/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE DR & SRT& TO ORDER APPELLANT'S TRANS- CRIPTS TO 4/3/87 RJG PANEL SCDATE 012387 SCHPRD DR
03/17/1987$50.00 DOCKETING FEE PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/17/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE- MENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 012387 SCHPRD DSA
03/20/1987$5 PAID TO DC TREASURER VS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/01/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/01/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 1 THRU 4 SL PANELPY SCDATE 032387 SCHPRD CHECK
05/11/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE DR & SRTPB PANEL SCDATE 051187 SCHPRD DR
05/13/1987COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS OF WERNER & ROBERT STRUPP AS COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/26/1987RECEIVED DESIGNATION OF RECORD JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/26/1987RECEIVED STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/02/1987RECEIVED COUNTER DESIGNATION OF RECORD PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/26/1987COUNTER DESIGNATION OF RECORD DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/26/1987DESIGNATION OF RECORD DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/26/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 05-08. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 052587 SCHPRD OPE
06/26/1987STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/21/1987RECEIVED LETTER FROM APPELLANT, PRO SE, DATED 7/16/87 MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/24/1987COPY OF SUPERIOR COURT LETTER TO APPELLANT REGARDING RECORD PICK UP - DATED 7/21/87 JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/27/1987RECORD ON APPEAL (30 PGS. - J & J) PM PANEL SCDATE 072787 SCHPRD R
09/10/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/21/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 102187 SCHPRD BA
11/09/1987LETTER FROM APPELLANT, PRO SE MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/27/1987ORDER GRANT APLT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND DISMISSING THIS APPEAL SL PANELPY SCDATE 110287 SCHPRD CHECK
11/27/1987DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -PY CITE
12/21/1987MANDATE ISSUED (RECALLED 5/25/89) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/26/1988RECEIVED LETTER FROM APPELLANT, PRO SE MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/08/1988LETTER DATED 11/3/88 FROM APPELLANT, PRO SE MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/21/1988MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF APLT TO REINSTATE APPEAL (APLT'S LTR OF 11/3/88) SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/21/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 9 THRU 12 SL PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/28/1988APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO REINSTATE APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 010389 SCHPRD ANSE
01/25/1989MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT MOTION TO REINSTATE APPEAL BY APPELLANT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/25/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S MOTION TO SUPPLE- MENT MOTION TO REINSTATE APPEAL (SHORT PAPER) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/03/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 13 THRU 16 SL PANELRO SCDATE 021689 SCHPRD Q
03/13/1989APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE ANSWER/RESPONSETO 3/3/89 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE TO MARCH 27TH JB PANEL SCDATE 031389 SCHPRD ANSA
03/24/1989MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION JOINT STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO SHOW CAUSE GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/14/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 17 THRU 20 SL PANELRBH SCDATE 040789 SCHPRD N
04/21/1989APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO 4-14-89 ORDER AD PANEL SCDATE 042189 SCHPRD ANSA
05/25/1989MANDATE RECALLED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/25/1989ORDER VACATING 11/27/87 ORDER DISMG APPEAL & REINSTATING; FO CLK, SUPER CT (SEE NOTES 21 & 22) PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/22/1989STATEMENT OF APPELLEE PER ORDER 5/25/89 MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/23/1989STATEMENT OF APPELLANT TO ORDER 5/25/89 MLR PANEL SCDATE 062689 SCHPRD CHECK
08/03/1989ORDER PARTIES TO FL STATEMENTS IN 10 AS TO STATUS OF SETTLEMENT PRO CEEDINGS. DAS PANELMK SCDATE 073189 SCHPRD X
08/09/1989STATEMENT OF APPELLEE TO 8-3-89 ORDER STATUS OF SETTLEMENT PROCEED- INGS AD PANEL SCDATE 081489 SCHPRD STATE
08/16/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO AUGUST 3RD COURT ORDER JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/17/1989MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLEE FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO AUGUST 3RD ORDER JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/21/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/15/1989FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
09/15/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE & CLK TO FL SUPP RESPONSE;GRANT MO OF APLT TO DISMISS & CASE DISMISSED.DS PANELRO SCDATE 090189 SCHPRD X
09/15/1989APPELLEE'S REPLY TO APLT'S MO TO DISMISS. DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/15/1989DISP NO - 02 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
10/06/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD