judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MAX C. GREENLEE JR. V. D.C. BOARD OF MEDICINE

Case Information: 89-AA-0048
Short Caption:MAX C. GREENLEE JR. V. D.C. BOARD OF MEDICINEClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Bd of Medicine (BMED)
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:01/23/1989

Opening Event Date:01/23/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/11/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerMax C. Greenlee, Jr.N
Carl V. AngelisYY
RespondentD.C. Board of MedicineN
Charles L. Reischel NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901GREENLEE JR., MAX C. D.C. BOARD OF MEDICINE
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 8/9/89 ORD: GRANTING MO FOR LV NOTE - 01 TO FILE RECORD; CLK TO FILE NOTE - 02 LODGED RECORD; DENYING MO TO NOTE - 02 COMPEL AND MO FOR SANCTIONS; NOTE - 03 BRIEFING OF PETNR DUE IN 40 NOTE - 03 DAYS. NOTE - 04 10/4/89 ORD: GRANT MO OF PTNR NOTE - 04 TO SUPP REC & RESP TO TRANSMIT NOTE - 05 DOCUMENTS LISTED IN PTNR'S NOTE - 05 MO TO THIS CRT AS SUPP REC; NOTE - 06 GRANT MO OF PTNR TO EXT TM TO NOTE - 06 FL BRF TO 10/18/89. NOTE - 07 2/14/90 ORD: GRANT MO OF PTNR NOTE - 07 TO SUPP REC & RESP TO TRANSMIT NOTE - 08 DOCUMENTS IN PTNR'S MO TO THIS NOTE - 08 CRT AS A SUPP REC; GRANT MO OF NOTE - 09 RESP TO EXT TM TO FL BRF BY NOTE - 09 3/9/90. NOTE - 10 REQUEST FOR EXT OF TM WILL BE NOTE - 10 LOOKED UPON WITH DISFAVOR AND NOTE - 11 GRT ONLY IN EXTRAORDINARY NOTE - 11 CIRCUMSTANCES. NOTE - 12 6/19/90 ORD: GRANT MO OF RESP NOTE - 12 TO REMAND CASE TO THE BOARD OF NOTE - 13 OF MEDICINE IN ORDER FOR THE NOTE - 13 BOARD TO AWARD A LICENSE TO NOTE - 14 PRACTICE MEDICINE TO PTNR; NOTE - 14 DENY MO OF PTNR FOR AWARD OF NOTE - 15 ATTORNEY'S FEES; COSTS ARE NOTE - 15 AWARDED TO PTNR IN AMOUNT OF NOTE - 16 $77.48; DENY REQ OF PTNR TO NOTE - 16 RETAIN JURISDICTION.
01/23/1989$50.00 DOCKETING FEE RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/23/1989PETITION FOR REVIEW OF A DECISION OF THE D.C. BOARD OF MEDICINE RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/26/1989CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD & CHARLES L. REISCHEL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/27/1989$5 PAID TO DC TREASURER PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/21/1989ORDER DIRG PTNR, W/IN 10 DAYS, TO FILE DSA OR CASE SHALL STAND DISMISSED. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/03/1989PETITIONER'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 030689 SCHPRD DSA
03/24/1989MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT TO COMPEL FILING FORTHWITH OF THE RECORD AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/03/1989RESP MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE THE RECORD TO APRIL 19, 1989 RJG PANEL SCDATE 021489 SCHPRD R
04/03/1989RESPONDENT'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FILING OF THE RECORD RJG PANEL SCDATE 040589 SCHPRD OPE
04/28/1989MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST APPELLEE MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/10/1989RESPONDENT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THE RECORD AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/10/1989RESPONDENT'S OPPOSITION TO APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS RJG PANEL SCDATE 051089 SCHPRD OPE
05/10/1989RECEIVED RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/18/1989PETITIONER'S REPLY TO APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SANCTIONS GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/09/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-03 CWC PANELRO SCDATE 060789 SCHPRD Q
08/09/1989RECORD ON APPEAL CWC PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/01/1989MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD (APPELLANT) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/18/1989PETITIONER'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO OCTOBER 18TH (NO OPE) JB PANEL SCDATE 091889 SCHPRD BA
10/04/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 04-06. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 092289 SCHPRD Q
10/11/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD AD PANEL SCDATE 110689 SCHPRD SR
10/18/1989PETITIONER'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR 25 DAYS TO NOVEMBER 13, 1989 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 101889 SCHPRD BA
10/25/1989ORDER GRANT PTNR MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 11/13/89. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 102389 SCHPRD V
11/13/1989PETITIONER'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 11-27-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 111389 SCHPRD BA
11/27/1989PETITIONER'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 12/01/89 (NO OPE) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/01/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD 12/4/89 RECVD APPENDIX TO BA PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/04/1989PTNR MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/11/1989PETITIONER'S BRIEF GW PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/11/1989ORDER GRANT MO TO FL APLT BRF; APLE BRIEF DUE IN 30 DAYS. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 112789 SCHPRD OPE
01/08/1990RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEBRUARY 9, 1990 AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/09/1990RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 9, 1990 (NO OPPO) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/14/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 07-09. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 012690 SCHPRD Q
03/08/1990RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 3-29-90 NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 030990 SCHPRD BE
03/13/1990RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO REMAND RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/14/1990ORDER GRT APLE MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRIEF TO 03/29/90. ANY FURTHER (SEE NOTE FIELDS 10 THRU 11)JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/28/1990PETITIONER'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO APLE'S MOTION FOR REMAND OF CASE FOR ISSUANCE OF LICENSE TO PETITIONER AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/04/1990RECEIVED APPELLANT'S MEMO IN SUPPORT OF AN AWARD OF ATTY'S FEES ON APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/04/1990RESPONDENT'S REPLY TO APPELLANT'S RESPONSE TO APLE'S MOTION TO REMAND RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/02/1990PETITIONER'S MOTION TO REMAND AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/19/1990FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
06/19/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 12-16. DAS PANELFETEFA SCDATE 061390 SCHPRD VS
06/19/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - RM METH -ORD JUDGE -PC CITE
07/11/1990MANDATE ISSUED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD