Case Information: 89-AA-0037 | |||
Short Caption: | SILFA GRANADOS V. D.C. DEPARTMENT OF EMPLOYMENT | Classification: | Agency - Administrative Agency - Unemployment Compensation |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | Filed Date: | 01/27/1989 | |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 01/27/1989 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 02/28/1989 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 06/29/1989 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 12/07/1989 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 03/01/1990 |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Petitioner | Silfa Granados | N | Pro Se | N | |||||
Respondent | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Respondent | D.C. Department of Employment Services | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | GRANADOS, SILFA D.C. DEPARTMENT OF EMPLOYMENT SERVICES (WORKMAN'S COMP.) | |||
01/01/1903 | NOTE - 01 1/27/89 ORD: GRNTG MO FOR LV NOTE - 01 TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS; NOTE - 02 CLK TO FL PET FOR REV & DOCKT NOTE - 02 STMT; RESP TO FILE RECORD IN NOTE - 03 15 DAYS; PETNR'S BRF DUE 40 NOTE - 03 DAYS THEREAFTER. | |||
01/19/1989 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
01/19/1989 | RECEIVED APPELLANT'S PETITION FOR REVIEW RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
01/24/1989 | PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPELLANT'S RJG PANEL SCDATE 013089 SCHPRD CHECK | |||
01/24/1989 | RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE- MENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 013089 SCHPRD DSA | |||
01/27/1989 | PETITIONER'S DOCKETING STATEMENT CWC PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
01/27/1989 | ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-03 CWC PANELMK SCDATE 012489 SCHPRD Q | |||
01/27/1989 | PETITION FOR REVIEW CWC PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
02/22/1989 | ORDER DIRG RESPONDENT, W/IN 15 DAYS, TO FILE RECORD ON APPEAL FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
02/28/1989 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
02/28/1989 | ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
02/28/1989 | RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 031089 SCHPRD R | |||
04/14/1989 | ORDER DIRG PTNR, W/IN 20 DAYS, TO FILE BRIEF OR CASE SHALL STAND DISMISSED. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
04/26/1989 | PETITIONER'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 050589 SCHPRD BA | |||
05/31/1989 | RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JUNE 30, 1989 RJG PANEL SCDATE 053189 SCHPRD BE | |||
06/22/1989 | ORDER GRANT MO OF RESP TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 6/30/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 061289 SCHPRD OPA | |||
06/29/1989 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
06/29/1989 | RESPONDENT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 063089 SCHPRD BE | |||
10/30/1989 | PTNR MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
12/07/1989 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
12/07/1989 | SUBMITTED PANELRGFAMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
12/12/1989 | ORDER GRANT PTNR'S MOTION FOR LV TO FL SUPP RECORD WITH 7/7/89 LTR FROM DR. MORRIS. MEH PANELROFAMK SCDATE 111489 SCHPRD VS | |||
12/12/1989 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD 7/7/89 LETTER FROM DR MORRIS MEH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
12/18/1989 | AFFIRMED MOJ AF DECISION ON REVIEW PANELRGFAMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
12/18/1989 | DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE | |||
03/01/1990 | MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD |