judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ROBINSON (DARWIN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 43977
Short Caption:ROBINSON (DARWIN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 30467
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C119924Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/27/2005How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/21/2004Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/21/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 04-17461
10/04/2004Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 04-18342
10/12/2004Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 04-18928
01/28/2005MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Motion to File Excess Page Brief. 05-01824
02/07/2005Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed January 28, 2005. The clerk shall file the 36-page opening brief and appendix received on January 21, 2005. Respondent shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the answering brief. 05-02402
02/07/2005BriefFiled Opening Brief. 05-01358
02/07/2005AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Volumes 1 and 2. 05-01359
03/11/2005BriefFiled Answering Brief. 05-04904
03/11/2005AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 05-04905
04/07/2005MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: April 25, 2005. 05-06874
04/27/2005BriefFiled Reply Brief. 05-08279
04/27/2005AppendixFiled Appendix to Reply Brief. 05-08282
04/27/2005Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
06/16/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP05-RR/MG/JH 05-11812
07/12/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 05-12774
07/12/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/22/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 15, 2005. 05-12774