Case: 05-13-01342-CR
05-13-01342-CR
09/26/2013
Sexual Assault
Brandon Dunte Luster
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
05/30/2014 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | State |
| ||
05/06/2014 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellant | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
11/08/2017 | Case forwarded to higher court | | |||||
04/07/2015 | Mandate issued |
| |||||
04/03/2015 | Petition for discretionary review was not filed | | |||||
12/31/2014 | Motion for extension of time to file petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal Appeals | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
12/01/2014 | Opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||||
12/01/2014 | Retention time case file will be retained | Retain | | ||||
11/12/2014 | Submitted | | |||||
11/04/2014 | Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argument |
| |||||
09/16/2014 | Set for submission on oral argument |
| |||||
06/05/2014 | State brief due | | |||||
05/30/2014 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
05/30/2014 | Brief filed - oral argument requested |
| |||||
05/06/2014 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | | |||||
05/06/2014 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
05/02/2014 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
05/01/2014 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
05/01/2014 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
04/10/2014 | Clerks record due | | |||||
04/01/2014 | Electronic Clerks Record Filed |
| |||||
03/20/2014 | Order entered | Otherwise Disposed |
| ||||
01/13/2014 | No clerks record filed in criminal case |
| |||||
01/10/2014 | Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed |
| |||||
01/10/2014 | Record due | | |||||
09/27/2013 | Docketing statement filed |
| |||||
09/26/2013 | Docketing statement due |
| |||||
09/26/2013 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
| |||||
09/13/2013 | Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court | | |||||
09/13/2013 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
09/12/2013 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/07/2015 | Case Stored | Permanent retention required in criminal case |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Luster, Brandon Dunte | Criminal - Appellant | Niles S. Illich |
THE STATE OF TEXAS | Criminal - State of Texas | G. Brian Garrison Susan Hawk |
Trial Court Information
363rd Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Tracy Holmes
F-0920707-W
Darline King