judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KYRIACOU (CHRISTOPHER) VS. STATE

Case Information: 43963
Short Caption:KYRIACOU (CHRISTOPHER) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):White Pine Co. - Seventh Judicial District - CR0106024Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/17/2004Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/17/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 04-17261
09/17/2004Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: June 7, 2004; June 8, 2004; June 9, 2004 and August 9, 2004. Court Reporter: Gloria Jean Smith. Filed in district court on: September 7, 2004. 04-17263
10/15/2004TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: June 7, 2004; June 8, 2004; June 9, 2004 and August 9, 2004. Court Reporter: Gloria Jean Smith. 04-19133
11/01/2004Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: November 4, 2004. 04-19987
11/04/2004MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion to Extend Time in Which to file Appellant's Fast Track Statement. 04-20338
11/12/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed November 4, 2004. Counsel for appellant shall have 20 days from the date of this order within which to file and serve the fast track statement. 04-20769
12/02/2004Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 04-22009
12/02/2004AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 04-22010
12/13/2004Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 04-22701
04/22/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP05-RR/MG/JH 05-07894
05/19/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 05-08053
05/19/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/27/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 3, 2005. 05-08053