judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WHISLER (DOUGLAS) VS. STATE

Case Information: 42033
Short Caption:WHISLER (DOUGLAS) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR012088Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:01/19/2005 at 9:00 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:01/19/2005How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/12/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/12/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 03-15314
10/07/2003TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: June 3-6, 2003 and August 20, 2003. Court Reporter: Isolde Zihn. 03-16681
12/01/2003MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 03-19978
12/04/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, no fast track statement has been filed. Appellant's counsel John E. Oakes shall file and serve the fast track statement and appendix within 10 days of this order or show cause why counsel for appellant should not be sanctioned. 03-20202
12/09/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant has moved for an extension of time to file the docketing statement. We note that docketing statements are not required to be filed in fast track appeals. We deny appellant's motion. 03-20496
12/16/2003Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 03-20950
01/06/2004Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Response due: January 12, 2004. 04-00254
01/12/2004Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 04-00680
01/12/2004AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 04-00681
03/15/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Full Briefing. This court has concluded that full briefing of this appeal is warranted. fn1[If a party's brief will cite to documents not previously filed in this court, that party must file and serve an appropriately documented supplemental appendix with the brief.] Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed as set forth in NRAP 31. fn2[On October 7, 2003, certified copies of transcripts of the proceedings below were filed. But should either party cite to transcripts not previously prepared, counsel shall file and serve a request for the necessary transcripts pursuant to NRAP 9(a). If the necessary transcripts have already been prepared and are on file in the district court, the parties may include such transcripts in a supplemental appendix without filing a transcript request form.] 04-04821
04/13/2004MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: May 14, 2004. 04-06828
05/12/2004BriefFiled Opening Brief. 04-08863
05/12/2004AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 04-08864
06/14/2004BriefFiled Answering Brief. 04-10863
06/14/2004AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. Respondent's Supplemental Appendix. 04-10864
07/26/2004Case Status Update Briefing Completed. No reply brief filed.
11/23/2004Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on January 19, 2005, at 9:00 a.m. (NNP05-WM/MD/RP)
01/04/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
01/19/2005Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP05-WM/MD/RP
07/28/2005Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before Maupin, Douglas and Parraguirre, JJ. Author: Parraguirre, J. We concur: Maupin and Douglas, JJ. 121 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 40. NNP05 05-14938
08/23/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 05-14962
08/23/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/21/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on September 12, 2005. 05-14962