Case Information: 91-CF-0908 | |||
Short Caption: | JEROME BECKWITH V. UNITED STATES | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | F12577-90 | Filed Date: | 07/29/1991 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 07/29/1991 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 01/29/1992 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 05/13/1992 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 10/21/1992 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 04/05/1993 |
Party Information | ||||||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | |||||||
Appellant | Jerome Beckwith | N | ||||||||||
Appellee | United States | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | BECKWITH, JEROME UNITED STATES | |||
01/01/1902 | NFX | |||
01/01/1903 | NOTE - 01 CODEF: WILLIAM E. BELT NOTE - 01 | |||
07/29/1991 | NOTICE OF APPEAL | |||
08/30/1991 | ORDER ATTY DEBORAH BARTHEL-CAPLAN, ESQ IS ASSGND TO REPRESENT APLT; DSA DUE IN 10. EVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
09/09/1991 | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE DS TO 10 DAYS PMB PANEL SCDATE 091091 SCHPRD DSA | |||
09/19/1991 | RECORD ON APPEAL (114 PGS. -- BURNS) (6/3/91 PROC.) PR PANEL SCDATE 093091 SCHPRD R | |||
09/20/1991 | APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
09/20/1991 | RECEIVED DSA PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
09/23/1991 | MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF CRT RPTR HUNT FOR EXT. OF TM TO FL 5/30/91 - 5/31/91 PROC. TO 10/4/91. PR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
10/07/1991 | APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
10/07/1991 | ORDER GRT APLT MOTIONS & LODGED DOCKETING STATEMENT IS FILED. JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 100491 SCHPRD B | |||
10/28/1991 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (12 PGS. -- BURNS) (6/4/91 PROC.) PR PANEL SCDATE 100591 SCHPRD RT | |||
12/26/1991 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (338 PGS/HUNT) PROC. 5/30-31/91 PMB PANEL SCDATE 112391 SCHPRD RT | |||
01/29/1992 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (5 PGS. -- TAPE) (7/25/91 PROCEEDINGS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 020692 SCHPRD CHECK | |||
01/29/1992 | RECORD COMPLETED | |||
03/02/1992 | ORDER BRF OF APLT DUE 40 DAYS FR DTD OF ORD & BRF OF APLE DUE 30 DAYS THEREAFTER. NFX. JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 022492 SCHPRD B | |||
04/13/1992 | APPELLANT'S BRIEF | |||
04/13/1992 | STATEMENT aplt's transcript references | |||
05/13/1992 | APPELLEE'S BRIEF | |||
05/13/1992 | BRIEFS COMPLETED | |||
06/12/1992 | FINAL SCREENING - SUMMARY CALENDAR I | |||
09/09/1992 | APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT | |||
09/28/1992 | CONSENT TO THE APPEARANCE OF LAW STUDENT Michael E. Urena LS# 6327 on behalf of appellant. | |||
10/06/1992 | RECEIVED appellant's reply brief. | |||
10/06/1992 | APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF (no oppo). | |||
10/21/1992 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
10/21/1992 | ARGUED WG KG MK Michael E. Urena, Esq. for appellant; James H. Dinan, Esq. for appellee. | |||
10/23/1992 | AFFIRMED MOJ (WG KG MK) | |||
10/30/1992 | ORDER GRANT APLT MOTION FOR LV TO FILE REPLY BRIEF and the lodged reply brief is hereby filed. (WAKGMK) | |||
10/30/1992 | APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF | |||
11/05/1992 | APLT'S PETITION FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANC | |||
02/05/1993 | ORD DENY APPELLANT'S PETITION FOR REH/REH EN BANC (EB) | |||
04/05/1993 | MANDATE ISSUED | |||
05/06/1993 | NOTICE OF FILING A PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARIin Supreme Court on 5/4/93. | Denied |