judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

AGUIRRE (MICHAEL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 42032
Short Caption:AGUIRRE (MICHAEL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR031109Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/12/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/12/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 03-15312
09/24/2003Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: August 7, 2003. Court Reporter: D. Vieira. Filed in district court on: September 8, 2003. 03-16033
10/23/2003Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: October 29, 2003. 03-17649
10/29/2003Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 03-18047
10/29/2003AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. - Joint Appendix. 03-18048
11/10/2003Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 03-18752
02/10/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP04-NB/DA/MG 04-02563
03/09/2004RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 04-02627
03/09/2004Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/29/2004RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 15, 2004. 04-02627