Case Information: 89-AA-0095 | |||
Short Caption: | RODRICK JONES V. D.C. DEPARTMENT OF EMPLOYMENT | Classification: | Agency - Administrative Agency - Unemployment Compensation |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | Filed Date: | 02/16/1989 | |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 02/16/1989 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 03/23/1989 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 07/26/1989 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 11/16/1989 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 01/03/1990 |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Petitioner | Rodrick Jones | N | Pro Se | N | |||||
Respondent | John Doe | N | |||||||
Respondent | D.C. Department of Employment Services | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | JONES, RODRICK D.C. DEPARTMENT OF EMPLOYMENT SERVICES (WORKMAN'S COMP.) | |||
01/01/1905 | TRDATE- 89/11/16 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - JONESROD FOR - pro se ATTY 2 - WHITEMA FOR - RESPONDENT | |||
02/01/1989 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
02/01/1989 | PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPELLANT'S RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
02/01/1989 | RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE- MENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
02/01/1989 | RECEIVED APPELLANT'S PETITION FOR REVIEW RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
02/16/1989 | PETITIONER'S DOCKETING STATEMENT DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
02/16/1989 | ORDER GRANT F/P MO OF PTNR & CLK TO FL DSA & PFR; RESP TO FL REC IN 15 DAYS. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 020889 SCHPRD Q | |||
02/16/1989 | PETITION FOR REVIEW DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
03/15/1989 | ORDER DIRG RESPONDENT, W/IN 15 DAYS, TO FILE RECORD FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
03/23/1989 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
03/23/1989 | ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
03/23/1989 | RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 033189 SCHPRD R | |||
03/31/1989 | PETITIONER'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 050289 SCHPRD BA | |||
05/08/1989 | RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 6-5-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 050589 SCHPRD BE | |||
07/03/1989 | MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLEE FOR LEAVE TO FILE MEMO IN LIEU OF BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
07/03/1989 | RECEIVED APPELLEE'S MEMO IN LIEU OF BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
07/11/1989 | PETITIONER'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO FILED MEMO AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
07/11/1989 | RECEIVED APPELLANT'S REPLY TO APLE'S MEMO AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
07/26/1989 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
07/26/1989 | RESPONDENT'S BRIEF (FOR ADS PURPOSES). PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
07/26/1989 | MEMORANDUM IN LIEU OF BRIEF OF RESPONDENT PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
07/26/1989 | ORDER GRT LODGED MEMO IN LIEU OF BRIEF AND FO THAT THIS CASE SHALL BE SCHED ASAP. PB PANELRBH SCDATE 071889 SCHPRD V | |||
10/11/1989 | MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR LEAVE TO FILE REQUEST FOR ORAL ARGUMENT LATE JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
10/11/1989 | RECEIVED APPELLANT'S REQUEST FOR ORAL ARGUMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
10/20/1989 | ORDER GRT PETNR'S REQUEST FOR ORAL ARGUMENT SL PANELRO SCDATE 101689 SCHPRD VS | |||
11/16/1989 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
11/16/1989 | ARGUED PANELSCFAKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
11/30/1989 | DISMISSED MOJ DISMISSING PETITION FOR REVIEW PANELSCFAKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
11/30/1989 | DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE | |||
01/03/1990 | MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD |