judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BARBEE (TIANNE) VS. STATE

Case Information: 43984
Short Caption:BARBEE (TIANNE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR040856Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/22/2004Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/22/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 04-17564
10/27/2004Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 04-19900
10/27/2004AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement.
11/17/2004Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 04-21115
03/04/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP05-WM/MD/RP 05-04274
03/29/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 05-04704
03/29/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/07/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on April 1, 2005. 05-04704