judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WILDE VS. WILDE

Case Information: 43987
Short Caption:WILDE VS. WILDECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D200980Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Child Custody
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/28/2004 / Worrell, CarolynSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/23/2004Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
09/23/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 04-17616
09/23/2004Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
09/23/2004Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
09/27/2004Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Israel L. Kunin - checl no. 10422.
09/28/2004Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/30/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Ecker & Kainen, Chtd., withdraws as counsel for respondent Cathy L. Pointer, f/k/a Cathy L. Wilde. 04-18119
10/04/2004Notice/Outgoing Letter. Carolyn Worrell. (Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney)
10/08/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Mr. Ecker was removed from this court's docket as counsel of record for respondent. Respondent shall, within 30 days from the date of this order, retain new counsel and cause new counsel to file a notice of appearance with this court. New counsel will be expected to participate in this court's settlement conference program. If respondent will not be retaining counsel for this appeal, she shall so inform this court in writing within the same period. 04-18697
10/21/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Certified copy filed in district court on October 13, 2004. 04-19522
11/04/2004Notice/Outgoing Letter. Carolyn Worrell. (case appeal statement)
11/08/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. April A. O'Brien shall serve as counsel of record for respondent. 04-20478
11/09/2004Notice/Outgoing Letter. Carolyn Worrell. (notice of appearance)
11/17/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order. to file Docketing Statement. To date, appellant has failed to file the docketing statement. Appellant shall have 10 days form the date of this order to file and serve the docketing statement. fn1[Appellant shall serve the docketing statement on counsel for respondent and on settlement judge Carolyn Worrell.] 04-21088
12/20/2004MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. and/or for Sanctions. 04-23185
01/12/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Withdrawal of Appeal. Appellant hereby moves to voluntarily withdraw the appeal. 05-00695
02/23/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Voluntary Dismissal. On January 12, 2005, appellant filed a notice of withdrawal of appeal. We elect to treat appellant's notice as a motion for voluntary dismissal. Cause appearing, we grant the motion and " . . . we dismiss this appeal." fn1[Because this order renders respondent's request to dismiss this appeal moot and because we find that sanctions are not warranted, we deny respondent's motion to dismiss the appeal and/or for sanctions.] SNP05-RR/MG/JH 05-03625
02/23/2005Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.