Case Information: 89-AA-0099 | |||
Short Caption: | BARBARA PINEDA V. D.C. DEPARTMENT OF EMPLOYMENT | Classification: | Agency - Administrative Agency - Unemployment Compensation |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | Filed Date: | ||
| |||
Opening Event Date: | Case Status: | Closed | |
Record Completed: | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | ||
Briefs Completed: | |||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 04/07/1989 |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Petitioner | Barbara Pineda | N | Pro Se | N | |||||
Respondent | D.C. Department of Employment Services | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | PINEDA, BARBARA D.C. DEPARTMENT OF EMPLOYMENT SERVICES | |||
01/01/1903 | NOTE - 01 2/15/89 ORDER DENIED WITHOUT NOTE - 01 PREJUDICE TO RENEWAL UPON NOTE - 02 ANSWERING QUESTION 1 (b) APLT NOTE - 02 W/IN 10 DAYS TO FL RENEWAL OR NOTE - 03 TENDER $50 DOCKETING FEE FAIL- NOTE - 03 URE TO COMPLY WILL RESULT IN NOTE - 04 DISMISSAL OF THIS APPEAL. NOTE - 04 | |||
02/03/1989 | PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPELLANT'S RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
02/03/1989 | RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE- MENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
02/03/1989 | RECEIVED APPELLANT'S PETITION FOR REVIEW RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
02/15/1989 | ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS: 1-4 PB PANELRO SCDATE 020889 SCHPRD Q | |||
03/09/1989 | Filed | OUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition | ||
03/09/1989 | ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL FOR PTNR'S FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH 2/15/89 ORDER. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
03/09/1989 | DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE | |||
04/07/1989 | MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD |