Case Information: 89-AA-0101 | |||
Short Caption: | GEBREMEDHIN T. TARE V. D.C. DEPARTMENT OF EMPLOYMENT | Classification: | Agency - Administrative Agency - Unemployment Compensation |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | Filed Date: | 02/03/1989 | |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 02/03/1989 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | ||
Briefs Completed: | |||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Petitioner | Gebremedhin T. Tare | N | Pro Se | N | |||||
Respondent | D.C. Department of Employment Services | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | TARE, GEBREMEDHIN T. D.C. DEPARTMENT OF EMPLOYMENT SERVICES | |||
01/01/1903 | NOTE - 01 3/23/89 ORD: PTNR TO SHOW NOTE - 01 CAUSE IN 10 DAYS WHY CASE SHLD NOTE - 02 NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE NOTE - 02 TO TENDER $50 FEE OR FL F/P NOTE - 03 MOTION. NOTE - 03 NOTE - 04 051689 OR: NOT BE DISMISSED NOTE - 04 FOR FAILURE TO TENDER $50 FEE NOTE - 05 OR FILE A MOT FOR LEAVE TO NOTE - 05 PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. FVH | |||
02/03/1989 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
02/03/1989 | RECEIVED APPELLANT'S PETITION FOR REVIEW RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
03/23/1989 | ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-03. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 032189 SCHPRD Q | |||
03/24/1989 | PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPELLANT'S RJG PANEL SCDATE 040389 SCHPRD ANSA | |||
04/25/1989 | ORDER DENY APLT MO TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS W/OUT PREJ. TO RENEWAL. PB PANELRO SCDATE 041089 SCHPRD Q | |||
05/16/1989 | ORDER DIRG PTNR TO SHOW CAUSE W/IN 10 DAYS WHY PETITION SHOULD (SEE NOTE FIELDS 4 & 5) PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
05/24/1989 | Filed | OUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition | ||
05/24/1989 | ORDER PFR DISMISSED FOR FAILURE OF PTNR TO RESP TO 4/25 ORD; CLK TO RETURN PFR TO PTNR. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 062689 SCHPRD ANSA | |||
05/24/1989 | DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE |