judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STATE VS. TOLOTTI (NICOLAS)

Case Information: 43951
Short Caption:STATE VS. TOLOTTI (NICOLAS)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 32899
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR981307Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:HardestyCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Justice Becker for Justice HardestyPanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/07/2005How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/15/2004Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/15/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 04-17023
09/27/2004Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 04-17804
10/05/2004MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 04-18403
10/05/2004Docketing StatementReceived Docketing Statement. 04-18404
10/08/2004Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed October 5, 2004. The clerk shall file the docketing statement received on October 5, 2004. 04-18692
10/08/2004Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 04-18404
01/03/2005OtherDisqualification of Justice Hardesty. Sat in district court proceedings.
01/14/2005MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: February 14, 2005. 05-00927
02/15/2005BriefFiled Opening Brief. 05-03061
02/15/2005AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 through 3. 05-03064
03/07/2005BriefFiled Answering Brief. 05-04401
03/07/2005AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. Vols. 1 and 2. 05-04402
04/07/2005BriefFiled Reply Brief. 05-06845
04/07/2005Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
05/26/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP05-NB/RR/MG 05-10383
06/21/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 05-10790
06/21/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/22/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 23, 2005. 05-10790