Case Information: 87-FM-1490 | |||
Short Caption: | TYDINGS, JOSEPH D. TYDINGS, TERRY H. | Classification: | Appeals - Family - Domestic Relations |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | D3175-85 | Filed Date: | 11/19/1987 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 11/19/1987 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | ||
Briefs Completed: | |||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 04/05/1988 |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellant | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | John Doe | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | TYDINGS, JOSEPH D. TYDINGS, TERRY H. | |||
01/01/1903 | NOTE - 01 SEE 8701491, 8701492 & NOTE - 01 8701493 NOTE - 03 3/14/88 ORD: REMOVING 87-1490 NOTE - 03 & 87-1493 FROM 3/29/88 SETT NOTE - 04 CNFERENCE CALENDAR & DISMISSNG NOTE - 04 THEM; 87-1491 AND 87-1492 TO NOTE - 05 REMAIN ON 3/29/88 SETT CONF NOTE - 05 CALENDAR; GRANTG MO TO EXT TM NOTE - 06 TO FILE DESIG OF REC AND STMT NOTE - 06 REGARDG TRANSCRIPT; CLK TO FL NOTE - 07 LODGED DESIG OF RECORD. NOTE - 07 | |||
11/19/1987 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
12/31/1987 | APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GREG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
12/31/1987 | $50.00 DOCKETING FEE GREG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
01/15/1988 | $5 PAID TO DC TREASURER JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
02/05/1988 | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE DR & SRTTO 2/15/88 PB PANEL SCDATE 112987 SCHPRD DR | |||
02/11/1988 | ORDER SS CONSOLIDATING 87-1490, 87-1491, 87-1492 & 87-1493 FOR ALL PURPOSES. FVH PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
02/17/1988 | RECEIVED DESIGNATION OF RECORD JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
02/22/1988 | COUNTER DESIGNATION OF RECORD RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
02/24/1988 | MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT'S TO SEVER, DISMISS AND CONSOLIDATE (NO OPPO) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
02/24/1988 | STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) OF APPELLEE PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
03/14/1988 | Filed | OUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition | ||
03/14/1988 | ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 03-07 CWC PANELPY SCDATE 032988 SCHPRD SCNF | |||
03/14/1988 | DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -PY CITE | |||
04/05/1988 | MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD |