judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ORPIADA (ANTONIO) VS. STATE

Case Information: 43966
Short Caption:ORPIADA (ANTONIO) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 56112
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR030174Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/17/2004Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/17/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 04-17278
09/21/2004TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: June 28, ,2004. Court Reporter: Marcia Ferrell. 04-17451
09/28/2004TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: June 25, 2004 and June 29, 2004. Court Reporter: Julie Ann Kernan. 04-17964
10/06/2004Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 04-18548
10/06/2004AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 04-18550
10/28/2004Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 04-19938
03/04/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order of Affirmance and Limited Remand to Correct the Judgment of Conviction. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED and REMAND this matter to the district court for the limited purpose of correcting the judgment of conviction." NNP05-WM/MD/RP 05-04265
03/29/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 05-04702
03/29/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/07/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on April 1, 2005. 05-04702
04/12/2005Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of Corrected Order filed in district court on March 18, 2005. 05-07149