Case Information: 87-PR-0982 | |||
Short Caption: | SPENCER, SAMUEL HENDERSON, ELISE M. | Classification: | Appeals - Probate - Probate |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | F113-86 | Filed Date: | 08/21/1987 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 08/21/1987 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 11/13/1987 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 01/28/1988 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 10/12/1988 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 03/05/1990 |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellant | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | John Doe | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | SPENCER, SAMUEL HENDERSON, ELISE M. IN RE ESTATE OF: | |||
01/01/1903 | NOTE - 01 1/11/90 ORD: GRT APLE'S MO TO NOTE - 01 FILE SUPPL BRF AND CLK IS NOTE - 02 DIRTD TO FILE LODGED SUPPL. NOTE - 02 BRF. FO THAT APLT W/I 20 DAYS NOTE - 03 MAY FILE A RESPONSE THERETO. NOTE - 03 | |||
01/01/1905 | TRDATE- 88/10/12 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - GRAHAMDO FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - CURTINM FOR - APPELLEE | |||
01/01/1906 | CURTINM FOR JULIA B. WILLIAMS WILLIAMSJU EST OF ELISE M. HENDERSON | |||
08/21/1987 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
08/26/1987 | RECEIVED DSA, DR & SRT MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
08/28/1987 | DESIGNATION OF RECORD MLH PANEL SCDATE 083187 SCHPRD CHECK | |||
08/28/1987 | APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
08/28/1987 | $50.00 DOCKETING FEE MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
08/28/1987 | STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
09/04/1987 | $5 PAID TO DC TREASURER JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
11/02/1987 | RECORD ON APPEAL (RTC) JB PANEL SCDATE 102087 SCHPRD R | |||
11/13/1987 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
11/13/1987 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (15 PGS - BOSTON) JB PANEL SCDATE 120287 SCHPRD RT | |||
11/17/1987 | ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
12/24/1987 | APPELLANT'S BRIEF MLH PANEL SCDATE 122887 SCHPRD BA | |||
01/28/1988 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
01/28/1988 | APPELEE'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 012888 SCHPRD BE | |||
02/11/1988 | APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
10/12/1988 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
10/12/1988 | ARGUED PANELMKBETE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
10/27/1989 | APLE MOTION FOR LV TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF/MEMORJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
10/27/1989 | RECEIVED APPELLEE'S SUPPLEMENTAL MEMO/ BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
01/11/1990 | ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 1 THRU 3 SL PANELBETEMK SCDATE 111689 SCHPRD VS | |||
01/11/1990 | APPELLEE'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF/MEMORANDUM SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
01/24/1990 | APPELLANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF/MEMORANDUM IN RESPONSE TO SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF OF APPELLEE AD PANEL SCDATE 013190 SCHPRD SMA | |||
01/30/1990 | MEMORANDUM TRANSMITTING SUPP BRF OF APLT TO DIVISION. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
02/12/1990 | AFFIRMED JUDGMENT AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELBETEMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
02/12/1990 | DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -MK CITE 569 A.2d 1194 | |||
02/12/1990 | OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - MK PAGE # - 0323 | |||
03/05/1990 | MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD |