judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

POWELL (DEREK) VS. STATE

Case Information: 43965
Short Caption:POWELL (DEREK) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR041220Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/17/2004Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/17/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 04-17275
09/17/2004Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: August 11, 2004. Court Reporter: I. Zihn. Filed in district court on: September 10, 2004. 04-17276
09/20/2004TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 8/11/04. Court Reporter: Isolde Zihn. 04-17316
10/27/2004Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 04-19902
10/27/2004AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 04-19903
11/17/2004Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 04-21118
01/31/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP05-NB/RR/JH 05-01960
02/25/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 05-02172
02/25/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/09/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on March 1, 2005. 05-02172