judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SHERIFF, WHITE PINE COUNTY VS. HARRIS

Case Information: 43964
Short Caption:SHERIFF, WHITE PINE COUNTY VS. HARRISCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):White Pine Co. - Seventh Judicial District - HC0407007Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Pretrial
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/30/2005How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/17/2004Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/17/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 04-17268
09/17/2004Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: transcript of hearing on Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Court Reporter: Gloria Jean Smith. Filed in district court on: September 8, 2004. 04-17270
09/23/2004TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: August 9, 2004. Court Reporter: Gloria Jean Smith. 04-17656
09/30/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Directing Transmission of Record. This is an appeal from an order of the district court granting a pretrial petition for a writ of habeas corpus. Accordingly, the clerk of the district court shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to transmit to the clerk of this court a certified copy of the complete district court record of the proceedings below on respondent's petition. Upon the filing of the record in this court, this appeal shall stand submitted for decision without further briefing or oral argument unless the court otherwise orders. 04-18104
10/12/2004Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 04-18931
10/12/2004Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
10/20/2004Other Other. Re-mailed copy of docketing statement to attorneys for Appellant (see case note.)
10/21/2004MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Response to Order Directing Transmission of Record and Notice of Demand for Transcript. 04-19472
11/02/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Full Briefing. This is a sheriff's appeal from an order of the district court granting respondent Shane D. Harris' pretrial petition for a writ of habeas corpus. This court has concluded that full briefing of this appeal is warranted. fn1[If a party's brief will cite to documents not previously filed in this court, that party must file and serve an appropriately documented supplemental appendix with the brief.] Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief. fn2[A certified transcript of the habeas corpus proceedings of August 9, 2004, was filed in this court. Should either counsel cite to transcripts not previously prepared, counsel shall file and serve a request for the necessary transcripts pursuant to NRAP 9(a). If the necessary transcripts have already been prepared and are on filed in the district court, the parties may include such transcripts in a supplemental appendix without filing a transcript request form. See NRAP 30(b)(1).] Thereafter, briefing shall proceed as set forth in NRAP 31. 04-20133
11/02/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On October 12, 2004, the record on appeal was filed in this court and the case was submitted for a decision on the record. Our review of the record reveals that documents necessary for this court's disposition of the appeal have not been included, specifically: (1) the criminal complaint; and (2) the criminal information. We direct the clerk of the district court to file in this court within 20 days from the date of this order the two noted documents. 04-20160
11/04/2004Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 04-20323
12/03/2004BriefFiled Opening Brief. 04-22142
12/03/2004AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 04-22143
01/03/2005MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: February 2, 2005. 05-00078
02/04/2005MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 05-02315
02/04/2005BriefReceived Answering Brief.
02/11/2005Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed February 4, 2005. The clerk shall file the answering brief received on February 4, 2005. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve a reply brief, if deemed necessary. 05-02763
02/11/2005BriefFiled Answering Brief. 05-02316
03/25/2005Case Status Update Briefing Completed. No reply brief filed.
03/30/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 05-06218
03/30/2005Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
04/21/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP05-WM/MD/RP 05-07848
05/17/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 05-07927
05/17/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/01/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 23, 2005. 05-07927