judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

NICASTRO (ROBERT) VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 43955
Short Caption:NICASTRO (ROBERT) VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 45467
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C197108Classification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Certiorari/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/17/2004Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/17/2004Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. 04-17190
09/17/2004MotionFiled Motion for Stay. Emergency Motion for Stay of District Court Proceedings. 04-17191
09/21/2004MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Emergency Motion for Stay of District Court Proceedings. 04-17447
09/23/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Corrected Certificate of Mailing - Opposition to Emergency Motion for Stay of District Court Proceedings. 04-17648
09/23/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Directing Answer and Granting Motion for Stay. The real party in interest, on behalf of the respondent district court, shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file an answer, including authorities, against issuance of the requested writ. Petitioner's emergency motion for a stay is hereby granted until further order of this court. 04-17659
10/15/2004Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. 04-19131
11/23/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. as Moot. "We deny this petition as moot, and we vacate our prior order staying the proceedings below." SNP04D-RR/WM/MD 04-21488
12/21/2004RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 04-21850
12/21/2004Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.