judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STATE VS. DIST. CT. (EPPERSON)

Case Information: 42048
Short Caption:STATE VS. DIST. CT. (EPPERSON)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 45243
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR031129Classification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Certiorari/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:04/14/2004 at 10:00 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:04/14/2004How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/16/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/16/2003Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. 03-15499
09/16/2003AppendixFiled Appendix. Petitioner's Appendix. 03-15500
09/24/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. The real parties in interest, on behalf of respondents, shall have 20 days from the date of this order within which to file an answer, including authorities, against issuance of the requested writ. 03-15988
10/14/2003Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. Claude Eric Epperson, Jr.'s Answer to Petitioner's Petition for Writ of Mandamus or, in the Alternative, Prohibition. 03-17076
10/15/2003Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. Answer of Real Party in Interest Brittania Larae Todd. 03-17131
10/15/2003MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief (Motion for extension of time to file Answer to petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition for Ryan Andrew Barnes). 03-17160
10/17/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Motion Granted in Part. Counsel for real party in interest, Ryan Andrew Barnes, shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file the answer. 03-17336
10/23/2003MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Reverse Order for a Stay of Proceedings (re. Discovery Order). 03-17711
10/28/2003MotionFiled Motion. Real Party in Interest Claude Eric Epperson, Jr.'s Motion for Consideration of Amended Answer to Petition. 03-18020
11/03/2003MotionFiled Motion. Motion of Nevada Attorneys for Criminal Justice for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Memorandum of Points and Authorities. 03-18216
11/03/2003Other Other. Received Memorandum of Points and Authorities. 03-18219
11/03/2003MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion to Reverse Order for a Stay of Proceedings (Re: Discovery). 03-18320
11/04/2003Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. (Ryan Andrew Barnes). 03-18356
11/06/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On October 28, 2003, Epperson filed a motion for leave to file an amended answer. We grant the motion. The clerk of this court shall file the amended answer provisionally submitted on October 28, 2003. On October 23, 2003, Epperson filed a motion to reverse the district court's order staying the proceedings in this matter. The State opposes the motion. We conclude that Epperson has not demonstrated good cause to reverse the district court's order. We deny this motion. On November 3, 2003, Nevada Attorneys for Criminal Justice filed a motion for leave to file a memorandum of points and authorities as amicus curiae. We grant the motion. The clerk of this court shall file the memorandum of points and authorities provisionally submitted on November 3, 2003. 03-18534
11/06/2003Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. Amended Answer of Real Party in Interest Claude Eric Epperson, Jr., to Petition for Writ of Mandamus or, in the alternative Prohibition. 03-18022
11/06/2003Other Other. Filed Memorandum of Points and Authorities. 03-18219
11/24/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, real party in interest Doni Kevin Hodge has neither filed an answer, nor communicated with this court respecting his intention to file or join in an answer. Accordingly, Hodge's counsel, attorney John J. Kadlic, shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file an answer to the requested writ, join in an answer submitted by another, or otherwise apprise this court respecting his intention to participate in this matter. 03-19538
12/01/2003Other Other. Filed Answer by Joinder (Doni Kevin Hodge). 03-19879
01/15/2004Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to Washoe County Clerk requesting minutes of September 11, 2003.
03/16/2004Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on April 14, 2004, at 11:00 a.m. (NNP04-NB/DA/MG)
03/30/2004Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
04/02/2004Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Rescheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is rescheduled for 30 minutes on April 14, 2004, at 10:00 a.m. (NNP04-NB/DA/MG)
04/14/2004Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP04-NB/DA/MG
05/13/2004Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Petition granted in part." We direct the clerk to issue a writ. Before Becker, Agosti and Gibbons, JJ. Author: Per Curiam. 120 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 30. NNP04 04-08884
05/13/2004WritIssued Writ. Original and one copy of writ and copy of opinion mailed to Gemma Greene Waldron for service upon Judge Steven R. Kosach. 04-08979
06/08/2004RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 04-09331
06/08/2004Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/23/2004WritFiled Writ. Served on Judge Steven Kosach on September 21, 2004. 04-08979