Case Information: 87-FM-1412 | |||
Short Caption: | GRIFFITH, MERVIN GRIFFITH, PAULINE E. | Classification: | Appeals - Family - Domestic Relations |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | D192-87 | Filed Date: | 12/15/1987 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 12/15/1987 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | ||
Briefs Completed: | |||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 12/06/1988 |
Party Information | |||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer |
Appellant | Mervin Griffith | N | Pro Se | N | |
Appellee | Pauline E. Griffith | N | Pro Se | N |
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | GRIFFITH, MERVIN GRIFFITH, PAULINE E. | |||
12/15/1987 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
12/17/1987 | RECEIVED DR & SRT. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
12/17/1987 | RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE- MENT MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
02/24/1988 | ORDER APLT IN 10 DAYS TO PAY FEE OR CASE DISMISSED. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 011488 SCHPRD CHECK | |||
03/04/1988 | $5 PAID TO DC TREASURER JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
03/24/1988 | DESIGNATION OF RECORD SRT. EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
03/24/1988 | APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
03/24/1988 | ORDER CLK TO FILE LDGD DR, SRT & DSA FO: APLT BR DUE 40 DAYS AFTER RECORD. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 030788 SCHPRD ANSA | |||
07/07/1988 | RECORD ON APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 052488 SCHPRD R | |||
07/11/1988 | ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
10/18/1988 | ORDER APLT BR DUE IN 10 DAYS OR CASE DISMISSED. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 082288 SCHPRD BA | |||
11/14/1988 | Filed | OUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition | ||
11/14/1988 | ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL. EBP PANELRO SCDATE 102888 SCHPRD BA | |||
11/14/1988 | DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE | |||
12/06/1988 | MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD |