judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GASTON (RICHARD) VS. STATE

Case Information: 42047
Short Caption:GASTON (RICHARD) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 37387 , 39860 , 42919 , 44525 , 45258 , 50122 , 60575 , 64719 , 69552 , 70234
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C115252Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:MaupinCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Justice Agosti for Justice MaupinPanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/16/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/16/2003OtherDisqualification of Justice Maupin.
09/16/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 03-15498
10/16/2003Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Appellant purports to appeal in proper person from a decision of the district court entered on August 11, 2003, denying appellant's motion to withdraw a guilty plea. The district court had not made a decision, oral or written, on appellant's motion at the time he filed his notice of appeal. fn1[In fact the documents before this court indicate that on August 11, 2003, the district court continued the matter and appointed counsel, Mr. Matthew D. Carling to assist appellant in the proceedings.] "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP04-DA/RR/ML 03-17200
11/12/2003RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 03-17566
11/12/2003Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/04/2003RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 14, 2003. 03-17566