Case Information: 87-PR-1033 | |||
Short Caption: | BUTLER, BRENDA DELORES HARRISON, LUTHER | Classification: | Appeals - Probate - Probate |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | ADM598-85 | Filed Date: | 08/14/1987 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 08/14/1987 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 10/13/1989 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 04/03/1990 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 06/12/1990 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 08/03/1990 |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | John Doe | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | BUTLER, BRENDA DELORES ET AL HARRISON, LUTHER ET AL | |||
01/01/1903 | NOTE - 01 2/20/90 ORD: THIS APPEAL NOTE - 01 SHOULD NOT BE CALENDARED ON NOTE - 02 THE RECORD AND APLT'S BRIEF NOTE - 02 ALONE. NOTE - 03 04/03/90 ORD: GRANTING APLES' NOTE - 03 MOTIONS & DIRG CLERK TO FILE NOTE - 04 APLES' LODGED RESPONSE & BRIEF NOTE - 04 FO CLK DIRED TO SCHEDULE CASE NOTE - 05 FOR CONSIDERATION BY A MERITS NOTE - 05 DIV AS SOON AS CALENDAR PERMIT | |||
01/01/1905 | TRDATE- 90/06/12 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - SILBERBERGH FOR - APPELLANTS ATTY 2 - GRIMESK FOR - APPELLEES | |||
08/14/1987 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
08/24/1987 | RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DESIGNATION OF RECORD RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
09/08/1987 | DESIGNATION OF RECORD RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
09/08/1987 | APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
09/08/1987 | $50.00 DOCKETING FEE PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
09/10/1987 | $5 PAID TO DC TREASURER JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
11/25/1987 | COPY OF SUPERIOR COURT LETTER TO APPELLANT'S COUNSEL RE RE- CORD PICK-UP DATED 11/23/87 MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
11/30/1987 | RECORD ON APPEAL RTC (ONE LARGE BROWN ENVELOPE OF EXHIBITS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 101387 SCHPRD R | |||
03/21/1989 | ORDER APLT BR DUE IN 40 DAYS. EBP PANELRBH SCDATE 082988 SCHPRD RT | |||
04/07/1989 | ORDER VACATE 3/21/89 ORDER; FO: APLT BR DUE 40 DAYS AFTER RT. EBP PANELRO SCDATE 050189 SCHPRD BA | |||
04/12/1989 | ORDER VACATE 3/21/89 ORDER; APLT BRF DUE 40 DAYS AFTER RT IS FILED. ACG PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
06/23/1989 | APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
06/30/1989 | APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STAY JB PANEL SCDATE 070589 SCHPRD OPE | |||
07/06/1989 | APPELLANT'S REPLY TO APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR STAY AND MOTION TO SEAL REAL PROPERTY JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
08/23/1989 | ORDER DENY MO W/OUT PREJUDICE TO APLT'S SEEKING A STAY IN SP CT IN THE FIRST INSTANCE. PB PANELFETEST SCDATE 080189 SCHPRD VS | |||
10/13/1989 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
10/13/1989 | ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
10/13/1989 | COURT REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT (284 PGS/J&J -TAPE) AD PANEL SCDATE 063089 SCHPRD RT | |||
11/21/1989 | APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 112289 SCHPRD BA | |||
02/20/1990 | ORDER APLES W/IN 20 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER SHOW CAUSE WHY (SEE NOTES 1 & 2) JB PANELRO SCDATE 122689 SCHPRD BE | |||
03/06/1990 | APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR 60 DAYS RJG PANEL SCDATE 031290 SCHPRD ANSE | |||
03/12/1990 | APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION TO APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR EXT. OF TIME TO FILE BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
03/13/1990 | APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE ANSWER/RESPONSETO COURT'S SHOW CAUSE ORDER AND TO FILE APPELLEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
03/13/1990 | RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
03/26/1990 | RECEIVED APPELLANT/ ANSWER/OPPOSITION TO OTSC & APLE'S MOTION FOR EXT. OF TIME RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
04/03/1990 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
04/03/1990 | APPELEE'S BRIEF FVH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
04/03/1990 | ORDER (SEE NOTE FIELDS 3 THRU 5) FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
04/03/1990 | APPELLEE'S REPLY TO COURT'S SHOW CAUSE ORDER & MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO FILE APPELLEES' BR. FVH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
05/04/1990 | APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
05/17/1990 | LETTER APLT'S REQUEST TO ARGUE ON 6/12 AT 1:30 PM GRANTED. MEH PANELDDW SCDATE 051690 SCHPRD OPE | |||
06/12/1990 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
06/12/1990 | ARGUED PANELRGNWFA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
07/13/1990 | AFFIRMED JUDGMENT AFFIRMING ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT PANELRGNEFA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
07/13/1990 | DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -NW CITE 578 A.2d 1098 | |||
07/13/1990 | OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - NW PAGE # - 1784 | |||
08/03/1990 | MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD |