judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

AMERIPRIDE SERVICES VS. BILL PEARCE MOTORS

Case Information: 43968
Short Caption:AMERIPRIDE SERVICES VS. BILL PEARCE MOTORSCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0206082Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/30/2004 / Manoukian, NoelSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/17/2004Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Lemons Grundy & Eisenberg--check no. 10412.
09/17/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 04-17294
09/22/2004Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Two notices of entry of orders filed 8/27/04. Due Date: 10 days
09/30/2004Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Noel E. Manoukian. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/30/2004Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 04-18128
10/01/2004Notice/Outgoing Letter. Noel E. Manoukian. (docketing statement)
10/05/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order. Notice of Entry of Order Granting Motion Made Pursuant to NRCP 41(b) and Dismissing Case with Prejudice filed in district court on August 27, 2004. 04-18372
10/05/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order. Notice of Entry of Order Granting Attorney's Fees and Costs filed in district court on August 27, 2004. 04-18373
10/06/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Docketing Statement served on settlement judge. 04-18551
01/19/2005Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 05-01214
01/19/2005Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 05-01215
01/26/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK 05-01651
01/26/2005Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.