judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LLOYD (STANLEY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 42029
Short Caption:LLOYD (STANLEY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C031414Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:DouglasCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Senior Justice Shearing for Justice DouglasPanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/13/2004How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/12/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/12/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 03-15302
10/22/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 120 days. See NRAP 11(a)(2) (each complete record shall contain each and every paper, pleading and other document filed, or submitted for filing, in the district court, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings.) fn1[The record shall not include any physical, non-documentary exhibits or the original documentary exhibits filed in the district court, but copies of documentary exhibits submitted in the district court proceedings shall be transmitted as part of the record on appeal. The record shall also include any presentence investigation reports submitted in this matter. The clerk of the district court shall transmit the reports to this court in a sealed envelope identifying the contents and marked confidential.] Nos. 41974/42021/42026/42029/42071 - cases are not consolidated. 03-17559
02/13/2004Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 and 2. 04-02859
02/13/2004Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
04/19/2004OtherDisqualification of Justice Douglas. Sat in district court proceedings.
04/29/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We have reviewed the record on appeal and conclude for the reasons stated in the attached order that the district court did not err in declining to review Lloyd's petition. Therefore briefing and oral argument are not warranted in this case. We note that NRS 34.738(2)(b) requires the district court to transfer a petition that is filed in an improper district court to the appropriate district court. We direct the clerk of the Eighth Judicial District Court to transfer Lloyd's petition to the clerk of the First Judicial District Court if the clerk has not already done so. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP04S-MS/RR/WM 04-07855
05/25/2004RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 04-08096
05/25/2004Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/16/2004RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 27, 2004. 04-08096