judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BUSCH (WILLIAM) VS. STATE

Case Information: 42044
Short Caption:BUSCH (WILLIAM) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C191943Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/16/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/16/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) 03-15487
09/26/2003Other Returned Mail. Receipt for Documents dated 09/16/03 addressed to William Busch returned by CCDC "Not in Custody at this Facility". No forwarding address.
10/06/2003TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: July 15, 2003 and July 16, 2003. Court Reporter: Maureen Schorn. 03-16597
01/21/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, no fast track statement has been filed. Appellant's counsel Victor J. Austin shall file and serve the fast track statement and appendix within 10 days of this order or show cause why counsel for appellant should not be sanctioned. 04-01252
02/02/2004Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 04-02065
02/02/2004AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 04-02066
02/18/2004Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 04-03104
04/26/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order of Affirmance and Limited Remand to Correct the Judgment of Conviction. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED and REMAND this matter to the district court for the limited purpose of correcting the judgment of conviction." NNP04-NB/DA/MG 04-07591
05/21/2004RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 04-07684
05/21/2004Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/16/2004RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 24, 2004. 04-07684