Events |
Event Date | Status | Description | Result |
01/01/1901 | | FITZGERALD, ALICE M. FITZGERALD, LORENZO C. | |
01/01/1903 | | NOTE - 01 112087 ORD: REMAND RECORD TO NOTE - 01 TRIAL COURT FOR CLARIFICATION NOTE - 02 OF ITS FINDINGS & FACT & NOTE - 02 CONCLUSIONS OF LAW; APPEAL NOTE - 03 CONTINUED TO BE STAY PENDING NOTE - 03 REMAND PROCEEDINGS; CLERK OF NOTE - 04 SUPER CRT TO TRANSMIT FINDINGS NOTE - 04 AS A SUPP RECORD. NOTE - 05 112387 ORD: FOR CLARIFICATION NOTE - 05 PURPOSES, THAT THE RECORD IS NOTE - 06 REMANDED TO THE TRIAL CRT FOR NOTE - 06 FURTHER EXPLANATION OF ITS NOTE - 07 BASIS FOR UTILIZING TWO NOTE - 07 SEPARATE THRESHOLD MEAN NOTE - 08 INCOMES IN REACHING ITS DETER NOTE - 08 MINATION OF THE RESPECTIVE NOTE - 09 SUPPORT CONTRIBUTIONS FOR NOTE - 09 APLT & APLE UNDER THE CHILD NOTE - 10 SUPPORT GUIDELINE. NOTE - 10 NOTE - 11 7/7/88 ORD: GRANT MO OF COUNSL NOTE - 11 FOR APLT & W/D APPRNC OF RUTH NOTE - 12 BANKS & CLK TO ENTR APRNC OF NOTE - 12 E. MARIE WILSON-LINDSAY FOR NOTE - 13 APLT; CLK TO FL BRF OF APLT; NOTE - 13 BRF OF APLE DUE IN 30 DAYS. NOTE - 14 103188 ORD: DENY MO TO STRIKE; NOTE - 14 GRANT THE FOLLOWING THE APPEAR NOTE - 15 AMICUS CURIAE: CHILDREN'S FUND NOTE - 15 D.C. CHAPTER OF THE NATIONAL NOTE - 16 CRISIS CENTER; FAMILY & CHILD NOTE - 16 SERVICES; FRED TAYLOR (EXEC NOTE - 17 DIRECTOR, FOR LOVE OF CHILDRN) NOTE - 17 THE WOMEN & THE LAW CLINIC OF NOTE - 18 THE AMERICAN UNIVERSITY'S WASH NOTE - 18 COLLEGE OF LAW; WOMEN'S BAR NOTE - 19 ASSO OF THE DIRECTOR OF NOTE - 19 COLUMBIA; DIANE M. BRENNEMAN; NOTE - 20 & CATHERINE C. WOODS; GRANT MO NOTE - 20 OF AMICUS CURIAE WOMEN'S LEGAL NOTE - 21 DEFENSE FUND FOR PERMISSION TO NOTE - 21 ARGUE & SHARE TIME W/APLE; NOTE - 22 GRANT MO OF AMICUS CURIAE NOTE - 22 WOMEN'S LEGAL DEFENSE FUND FOR NOTE - 23 PERMISSION TO FL A CORRECTED NOTE - 23 BRF & VOLUME I OF THE APPENDX NOTE - 24 & THE CLERK IS DIRECTED TO FL NOTE - 24 THE SAME. NOTE - 25 12/1/88 ORD: DENY MO OF D.C. NOTE - 25 TO INTERVENE & CLK TO ENTER NOTE - 26 APPRNC OF D.C. AS AMICUS NOTE - 26 CURIAE & TO FL BRF OF D.C.; NOTE - 27 GRANT MO OF APLT FOR LV TO FL NOTE - 27 REPLY BRF & CLK TO FL BRF. NOTE - 28 NAT COUNCIL FOR CHILDREN'S NOTE - 28 RIGHTS ON BEHALF OF APPELLANT. NOTE - 29 12/29/88 ORD: GRANT MO & APLE NOTE - 29 TO HAVE 10 MINUTES ADDT'L FOR NOTE - 30 ARGUMENT WHICH WILL BE ALLOCA- NOTE - 30 TED TO AMICUS, D.C.; APLT TO NOTE - 31 HAVE 10 MINUTED FOR ARGUMENT NOTE - 31 TO BE DISTRIBUTED AMONGST NOTE - 32 APLT & AMICI, NAT'L COUNCIL NOTE - 32 FOR CHILDRENS' REIGHTS & NOTE - 33 GREATER WASH. CHAPTER. NOTE - 33 NOTE - 34 RECEIVED 3/8/89 RE RULE 28(K) NOTE - 34 FROM A.C.(NA. COUNCIL ETC) MLR NOTE - 35 7/31/89 ORD: DENY MO OF APLT NOTE - 35 TO CONS 87-1259 & 89-536;GRANT NOTE - 36 MO OF APLT TO EXPEDITE RULING NOTE - 36 OF ISSUES IN THIS CASE;EXECU- NOTE - 37 TION OF THE COMITMENT PURSUANT NOTE - 37 TO THE ORDER OF THE TRL CRT NOTE - 38 IN 89-536, DATED 5/3/89 IS NOTE - 38 STAYED PENDG F/O OF THIS CRT. NOTE - 39 3/7/90 ORD: GRT MO OF D.C. AND NOTE - 39 WOMEN'S LEGAL DEFENSE FUND TO NOTE - 40 FILE BRFS AS AMICUS CURIAE AND NOTE - 40 CLK IS DIRTD TO FILE LODGED NOTE - 41 BRFS OF D.C. AND WOMEN'S LEGAL NOTE - 41 DEFENSE FUND. JUDGE SCHWELB NOTE - 42 HAS RECUSED HIMSELF FROM THIS NOTE - 42 CASE. STATEMENT PER JUDGE NOTE - 43 FERREN, WITH WHOM JUDGES NOTE - 43 BELSON, STEADMAN, & FARRELL NOTE - 44 JOIN, STATING REASONS FOR NOT NOTE - 44 CALLING FOR A VOTE TO REHEAR NOTE - 45 THE CASE EN BANC TYPED IN THIS NOTE - 45 ORDER. | |
01/01/1904 | | JUDGE - SW AUTHOR - RECUSED - Y | |
01/01/1905 | | TRDATE- 89/01/04 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - LORDS FOR - AMICUS CURIAE ATTY 2 - REISCHELC FOR - APPELLEE TRDATE- 89/01/04 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - WILSON-LINDSAYE FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - HENRYR FOR - AMICUS CURIAE ATTY 3 - KAVANAGHT FOR - APPELLEE | |
01/01/1906 | | BANKSR WITHDRAWN 7/7/88. SIMONC WOMEN'S LEGAL DEFENSE FUND LORDS FOR: WOMEN'S LEGAL DEFENSE FND HENRYR NAT.COUNCIL FOR CHILDREN RIGHT | |
11/09/1987 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | |
11/09/1987 | | APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
11/13/1987 | | ORDER GRANT TEMPORARY STAY UNTIL NOVEMBER 20, 1987 SL PANELMKRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
11/13/1987 | | $5 PAID TO DC TREASURER JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
11/16/1987 | | APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION TO APPLICATION FOR STAY OF THE DECISION & ORD PENDENTE LITE FOR CHILD SUPP., ETC. RJG PANEL SCDATE 111687 SCHPRD OPE | |
11/16/1987 | | RECEIVED LIMITED APPEARANCE BY COUNSEL FOR APPELLEE RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
11/19/1987 | | APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
11/20/1987 | | ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-04 ACG PANELMKRO SCDATE 111287 SCHPRD VS | |
11/20/1987 | | APPELLANT'S REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO APPLICATION FOR STAY JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
11/23/1987 | | ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 05-10 ACG PANELMKRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
12/04/1987 | | MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLEE TO SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL FROM M. WEITZMAN TO T. KAVANAGH RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
01/04/1988 | | ORDER VACATE 11/20/87 STAY BY THIS CRT; DENY MO FOR STAY; APLT TO FL DR/SRT IN 10 DAYS. ACG PANELMKRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
01/14/1988 | | DESIGNATION OF RECORD & STATEMENT RE TRANSCRIPT PB PANEL SCDATE 011488 SCHPRD DR | |
02/18/1988 | | RECEIVED ORDER FROM SUPERIOR COURT (JUDGE KRAMER) REGARDING NOVEMBER 23RD ORD JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
03/24/1988 | | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD # 1(ORDER) RJG PANEL SCDATE 113087 SCHPRD SR | |
04/12/1988 | | ORDER APLT TO MAKE NEC ARRANGEMENTS TO HAVE RECORD FILED IN THIS CRT FORTHWITH. ACG PANELPY SCDATE 040488 SCHPRD CHECK | |
05/02/1988 | Filed | Record Completed | |
05/02/1988 | | RECORD ON APPEAL (375 PGS - SHELTON) JB PANEL SCDATE 050188 SCHPRD R | |
05/03/1988 | | ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
05/25/1988 | | COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS OF RUTH R. BANKS COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
06/07/1988 | | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AFTER RULING ON MOTION TO WITHDRAW RJG PANEL SCDATE 061388 SCHPRD BA | |
06/14/1988 | | RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF (MXBA STILL PENDING) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
06/20/1988 | | MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT'S COUNSEL, RUTH R. BANKS TO WITHDRAW MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
06/27/1988 | | RECEIVED APLE'S CONSENT TO FILE BRIEF 0F AMICUS CURIAE BY WOMAN'S LEGAL DEFENSE FUND GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
06/27/1988 | | RECEIVED APLT'S CONSENT TO FILE BRIEF OF AMICUS CURIAE BY WOMAN'S LEGAL DEFENSE FUND GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
07/06/1988 | | APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 7/27/88 (NO OPA) MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
07/07/1988 | | APPELLANT'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
07/07/1988 | | ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 11-13. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 070188 SCHPRD X | |
07/11/1988 | | ORDER GRANT CONSENT OF APLT & APLE FOR WOMENS LEGAL DEFENSE FUND TO FL BAC BY 8/8/88. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 070788 SCHPRD Q | |
08/05/1988 | | APPELEE'S BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 080888 SCHPRD BE | |
08/08/1988 | | AMICUS CURIAE'S BRIEF WOMEN'S LEGAL DEFENSE FUND (WLDF) FOR APPELLEE & APPENDIX (VOLUMES I & II) JB PANEL SCDATE 080888 SCHPRD BAC | |
08/08/1988 | | APPELLEE'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT AMICUS CURIAE (WLDF) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
08/10/1988 | | MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF AMICUS CURIAE (MLDF) FOR LEAVE TO FILE CORRECTED BRIEF & APPENDIX VOLUME I JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
08/10/1988 | | RECEIVED AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF & APPENDIX TO VOLUME I (WLDF) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
08/15/1988 | | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (28 PGS - SHELTON) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
08/18/1988 | | MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE OF (D.C.) ON BEHALF OF APPELLEE & TO FILE IT'S BRIEF BY SEPTEMBER 16TH JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
08/18/1988 | | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE APPELLEE'S & AMICI CURIAE'S BRIEFS & APPEAR. OF WOMEN'S LEGAL DEFENSE FUND RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
08/18/1988 | | APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF TO SEPTEMBER 15, 1988 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
08/18/1988 | | APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION TO AMICI CURIAE'S MOTION FOR ORAL ARGUMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 082288 SCHPRD OPA | |
08/25/1988 | | MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF AMICUS CURIAE (MLDF) FOR LV TO JOIN BRIEF OF CHILDREN'S DEFENSE FUND, ETC. JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
08/25/1988 | | AMICUS CURIAE'S OPPOSITION TO APLT'S MOTION TO STRIKE APLE'S & AMICI'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
08/25/1988 | | AMICUS CURIAE'S REPLY TO APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION TO AMICI'S MOTION FOR ORAL ARG. RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
08/30/1988 | | APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION TO D.C. MOTION TO INTERVENE AND FILE BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 083088 SCHPRD OP | |
08/31/1988 | | APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION TO APPELLANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
09/15/1988 | | MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF D.C. TO FILE BRIEF AFTER RULING ON MOTION TO INTERVENE RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
09/15/1988 | | RECEIVED APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
10/06/1988 | | RECEIVED APPELLEE'S (D.C.) MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
10/06/1988 | | RECEIVED APPELLEE'S (D.C.) BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
10/31/1988 | | AMICUS CURIAE'S BRIEF (CORRECTED BRIEF & VOLUME I) WOMEN'S LEGAL DEFENSE FUND ACG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
10/31/1988 | | ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 14-24 ACG PANELFERO SCDATE 101188 SCHPRD VS | |
12/01/1988 | | AMICUS CURIAE'S BRIEF DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA. DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
12/01/1988 | | ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 25-27. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 112388 SCHPRD VS | |
12/01/1988 | | APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
12/05/1988 | | LETTER DATED 12-2-88 PER RULE 28(U) FROM AMICUS CURIAE, WLDF PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
12/06/1988 | | MEMORANDUM TRANSMITTING 12/5/88 CUTATION PURSUANT TO 28(K) TO DIVISION. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
12/07/1988 | | MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF AMICUS CURIAE (D.C.) TO BE PERMITTED 10 MINUTES FOR ORAL ARGUMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
12/13/1988 | | APPEARANCE OF SANDRA LORD ON BEHALF OF WOMEN'S LEGAL DEFENSE FUND AS PRESENTING ORAL ARG. RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
12/19/1988 | | AMICUS CURIAE'S BRIEF OF (NATIONAL COUNCIL FOR CHILDREN'S RIGHTS) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
12/19/1988 | | MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF AC (NATIONAL COUNCIL FOR CHILDREN'S RIGHTS) FOR ADDI- TIONAL TIME FOR ARGUMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
12/19/1988 | | ORDER GRANT MO OF D.C. TO PARTICIPAT IN ORAL ARG. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 121288 SCHPRD VS | |
12/19/1988 | | RECEIVED CONSENT OF APPELLANT AND APPELLEE TO FILING OF BRIEF AMICUS CURIAE (SEE NOTE 28) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
12/21/1988 | | MEMORANDUM TRANSMITTING 12/19 AMICI CURIAE BRF & CONSENT TO DIVISION. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 010389 SCHPRD OPE | |
12/21/1988 | | MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF INTERVENOR (D.C.) FOR 10 MINUTES ADDITIONAL TIME FOR ARGUMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
12/29/1988 | | ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 29-33. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 010389 SCHPRD OPA | |
01/04/1989 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | |
01/04/1989 | | ARGUED PANELRGTEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
01/11/1989 | | MEMORANDUM TRANSMITTING 1/10/89 CITATION TO DIVISION. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
01/23/1989 | | LETTER OF AMICUS CURIAE, WOMEN'S LEGAL DEFENSE FUND PURSUANT TO RULE 28(K) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
01/24/1989 | | MEMORANDUM TRANSMITTING 1/23/89 CITATION TO DIVISION. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
02/27/1989 | | LETTER FROM APPELLEE (CC) PURSUANT TO RULE 28(K) MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
03/02/1989 | | LETTER DATED 2/28/89 FROM A.C.(WLDF) PURSUANT TO RULE 28(K) MLR (SUPPLEMENTAL) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
03/03/1989 | | MEMORANDUM TRANSMITTING 2/27/89 & 3/2/89 CITATIONS TO DIVISION. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
03/08/1989 | | LETTER OF COUNSEL FOR AMICUS CURIAE PURSUANT TO RULE 28(K) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
03/13/1989 | | MEMORANDUM TRANSMITTING 3/8/89 CITATION TO DIVISION. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
03/15/1989 | | LETTER DATED 3/14/89 FROM A.C., WO- MEN'S LEGAL DEFENSE FUND, IN RESPONSE TO LETTER (NOTE 34) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
03/15/1989 | | RECEIVED APPELLANT'S (WLDF) RESPONSE TO THE SUBMISSION OF UNPUBLISHED OPINION JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
03/16/1989 | | MEMORANDUM TRANSMITTING 3/15/89 LTR OF APLT TO DIVISION. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
03/16/1989 | | RECEIVED ANSWER OF A.C., WLDF, TO LET- TER OF APPELLANT, RE RULE 28 (K) MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
07/11/1989 | | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE WITH 89-536 JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
07/11/1989 | | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXPEDITE APPEAL APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
07/31/1989 | | ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 35-38. DAS PANELROTEST SCDATE 071389 SCHPRD VS | |
08/24/1989 | | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3(19 PGS/WILLIAMS) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
10/13/1989 | | AFFIRMED IN PART/REVERSED IN PART JUDGMENT AF/RV IN PART TRIAL COURT JUDGMENT PANELRGTEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
10/13/1989 | | DISP NO - 01 DISP - AFRV METH -OPN JUDGE -RO CITE 566 A.2d 719 | |
10/13/1989 | | OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - RO PAGE # - 2403 -A OPINION TYPE C JUDGE - TE PAGE # - 0000 OPINION TYPE C JUDGE - ST PAGE # - 0000 (CONCURRING & DISSENTING) | |
10/23/1989 | | MOTION TO EXT TM TO FILE PET FOR REH/REH EN BANC OF APPELLEE TO NOVEMBER 27, 1989 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
11/01/1989 | | ORDER GRT APLE'S MO TO FILE PET. AND PET FOR REH/REH EB SHALL BE FILED W/I 14 DAYS SL PANELROTEST SCDATE 102489 SCHPRD VS | |
11/15/1989 | Filed | Briefing Completed | |
11/15/1989 | | APPELEE'S BRIEF OF D.C. IN SUPPORT OF APLE'S MRRB FILED 11-15-89 PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
11/15/1989 | | APLE MOTION FOR LV TO FILE BRF IN EXCESS OF PAGES WOMEN'S LEGAL DEFENSE FUND ETC. AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
11/15/1989 | | PETITION FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANC OF APLE AD PANEL SCDATE 111589 SCHPRD MRRB | |
11/15/1989 | | RECEIVED BAC OF WOMEN'S LEGAL DEFENSE FUND ETC. IN SUPPOR OF APLE AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
11/16/1989 | | AMICUS CURIAE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF OF D.C. FOR LEAVE TO FILE CORRECTED BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF APLE MRRB AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
11/16/1989 | | RECEIVED CORRECTED BAC OF D.C. IN SUPPORT OF APLE MRRB AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
11/27/1989 | | RECEIVED APPELLANT'S OPPO TO (D.C.'S) MO TO FILE BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR REHEARING JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
11/27/1989 | | RECEIVED APPELLANT'S OPPO TO WOMEN'S LEGAL DEFENSE FUND MO TO FILE PETITION FOR REHEARING JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
11/30/1989 | | RECEIVED REPLY OF AC TO APLT'S OPPOSI- TION TO MO FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRF IN EXCESS OF PG LIM. RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
12/27/1989 | | ORDER DIRG APLT, W/IN 20 DAYS, TO FILE RESPONSE TO PETITION FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
01/03/1990 | | MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF AMICUS (APLE'S) D.C. TO FILE COPIES OF NEW LEGISLATION AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
01/17/1990 | | MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION NEW LEGISLATION ADOPTG REVISED CHILD SUPPORT GUIDELINE SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
01/17/1990 | | ORDER GRT MO. OF D.C. TO FILE NEW LEGISLATION ADOPTG REVISED CHILD SUPPORT GUIDELINE SL PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
01/17/1990 | | APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION TO APPELLEE'S PETITION FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANC RJG PANEL SCDATE 011890 SCHPRD ANSA | |
01/17/1990 | | APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION TO APPELLEE'S PETITION FOR REHEARING EN BANC RJG PANEL SCDATE 011690 SCHPRD OPA | |
03/07/1990 | | AMICUS CURIAE'S BRIEF OF DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
03/07/1990 | | AMICUS CURIAE'S BRIEF OF WOMEN'S LEGAL DEFENSE FUND SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |
03/14/1990 | | MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |