judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WILLIAMS VS. HENDLEY

Case Information: 42040
Short Caption:WILLIAMS VS. HENDLEYCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A467619Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/16/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/16/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 03-15452
10/23/2003Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. In this case, the district court's minute order specifically schedules a future hearing on appellant's motion for a preliminary injunction. Consequently, the order is not substantially appealable. As we lack jurisdiction to consider this appeal, " . . . we dismiss it." NNP04S-NB/MS/MG 03-17712
11/18/2003RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 03-18093
11/18/2003Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/04/2003RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 20, 2003. 03-18093