judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CTR. VS. BURNSTEIN

Case Information: 42041
Short Caption:UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CTR. VS. BURNSTEINCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 41845
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A468068Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/16/2003Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Alverson Taylor Mortensen Nelson & Sanders--check no. 46555.
09/16/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 03-15457
10/01/2003Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 03-16320
10/01/2003Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 03-16321
11/26/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. The briefing schedule in this appeal shall be suspended pending further order of this court. Respondents may file any reply within 10 days from the date that appellant's response is served. 03-19787
12/08/2003MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 03-20331
12/15/2003MotionFiled Reply to Response. SEIU Local 1107's Response in Support of the Nevada Supreme Court's Order to Show Cause. 03-20777
01/28/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP04S-MS/RR/WM 04-01793
02/24/2004RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 04-01824
02/24/2004Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/08/2004RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 26, 2004. 04-01824