judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MILES (ALFRED) VS. STATE

Case Information: 42045
Short Caption:MILES (ALFRED) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR97P1635Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/16/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/16/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) 03-15493
09/22/2003MotionFiled Motion. Motion to be Relieved as Counsel on Appeal and Motion, Pursuant to NRAP 2, for Suspension of Filing Deadlines Pending this Court's Ruling on the Instant Motion. 03-15819
09/30/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. of the Washoe County Public Defender's office to be relieved as counsel on appeal, filed September 22, 2003. The Washoe County Public Defender's office is relieved of any further obligation regarding this appeal. Roger Harada is hereby ordered to comply with NRAP 3C and, within 10 days from the date of this order, file on behalf of this appellant a transcript request form or a certificate stating that no transcript is required and shall file a fast track statement (and appendix) within 40 days of this order. Thereafter, this appeal shall proceed in accordance with the provisions of NRAP 3C. 03-16297
10/06/2003Other Returned Mail. Order filed 09/30/03 addressed to Roger Harada remailed to corrected address.
10/17/2003TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: August 19, 2003. Court Reporter: Donna Davidson. 03-17317
10/22/2003Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 08/19/03. Court Reporter: Donna Davidson. Filed in district court on: 10/10/03. 03-17635
10/30/2003MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 03-18119
11/05/2003Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed October 30, 2003. Appellant shall hve until November 21, 2003, to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix. 03-18417
11/21/2003Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 03-19490
11/21/2003AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. - Joint Appendix. 03-19492
12/12/2003Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 03-20717
06/10/2004Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Before Shearing, C.J., Rose and Maupin, JJ. Author: Per Curiam. 120 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 42. SNP04S 04-10737
07/06/2004RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 04-11422
07/06/2004Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/04/2004RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 12, 2004. 04-11422