Case Information: 87-FM-1398 | |||
Short Caption: | OLIVER, FRANKLIN JUSTICE OLIVER, WANDA CLEGG | Classification: | Appeals - Family - Domestic Relations |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | D2784-87 | Filed Date: | 12/22/1987 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 12/22/1987 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 01/13/1988 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | |||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | John Doe | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | OLIVER, FRANKLIN JUSTICE OLIVER, WANDA CLEGG | |||
12/22/1987 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
12/22/1987 | DESIGNATION OF RECORD & SRT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
12/22/1987 | APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
12/22/1987 | $50.00 DOCKETING FEE RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
12/28/1987 | $5 PAID TO DC TREASURER JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
01/13/1988 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
01/13/1988 | ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
01/13/1988 | RECORD ON APPEAL (RTC) RJG PANEL SCDATE 022288 SCHPRD R | |||
01/13/1988 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (12 PGS - BOSTON) JB PANEL SCDATE 021688 SCHPRD RT | |||
02/22/1988 | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 3/14/88 PB PANEL SCDATE 022288 SCHPRD BA | |||
03/17/1988 | ORDER BRF OF APLT DUE IN 10 DAYS. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 030988 SCHPRD Q | |||
03/18/1988 | APPELLEE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
03/23/1988 | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 032888 SCHPRD BA | |||
03/25/1988 | Filed | OUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition | ||
03/25/1988 | ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO DISMISS & DISMISS APPEAL. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 032588 SCHPRD SCNF | |||
03/25/1988 | DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -PY CITE |