judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HOUSTON (HORACE) VS. STATE C/W 42011

Case Information: 42046
Short Caption:HOUSTON (HORACE) VS. STATE C/W 42011Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated: 42011 *, 42046Related Case(s): 41714 , 42011 , 42039 , 42067 , 47767 , 48884 , 51957 , 55607 , 65651 , 69629 , 69629-COA , 73884 , 73884-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C189058Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/06/2004How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/16/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/16/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 03-15495
09/16/2003Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
09/16/2003Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days.
09/25/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Copy filed in district court on September 18, 2003. (not certified) 03-16088
11/25/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, appellant has failed to comply with this court's notice issued on September 16, 2003. Appellant shall within 10 days of the date of this order, file proof of service of the notice of appeal. To date appellant has failed to file the docketing statement. Appellant shall, within 10 days from the date of this order, file and serve the docketing statement. Appellant has failed to file either a transcript request form or a certificate indicating that no transcripts are being requested. Appellant shall, within 10 days from the date of this order, file the appropriate document pursuant to NRAP 9. We caution counsel for appellant that failure to comply timely with this order may result in the imposition of sanctions. See NRAP 9(a)(3); NRAP 14(c). 03-19719
12/17/2003MotionFiled Motion to Consolidate. Nos. 42011/42046. 03-21044
12/23/2003Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. to consolidate filed on December 17, 2003. The above-entitled appeals are consolidated for all appellate purposes. Pursuant to the order entered on December 1, 2003, in Docket No. 42011, appellant shall have until March 30, 2004, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). Nos. 4201/42046. (03-21398)
12/26/2003Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. (Request for Rough Draft Transcripts). Nos. 42011/42046 (03-21451).
04/02/2004BriefFiled Opening Brief. Nos. 42011/42046 (04-06149).
05/07/2004MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Nos. 42011/42046 (04-08560).
05/18/2004BriefReceived Answering Brief. Nos. 42011/42046 (04-09253).
05/20/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filedTo date, appellant has not filed the appendix to the opening brief. Appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file the appendix to the opening brief. Respondent has moved for an extension of time to file the answering brief for these consolidated appeals. Cause appearing, we grant the motion. The clerk shall file the answering brief received on May 18, 2004. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve a reply brief, if deemed necessary. Nos. 42011/42026 [04-09349]
05/20/2004BriefFiled Answering Brief. Nos. 42011/42046 (04-09253).
06/21/2004BriefFiled Reply Brief. Nos. 42011/42046 (04-11303).
06/21/2004AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Nos. 42011/42046 (04-11304).
06/28/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Certificate of Service of the Appellant's Reply Brief and Appendix. Nos. 42011/42046. (04-11829)
07/06/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and these appeal shall stand submitted for decision as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. Nos. 42011/42046. (04-12236)
07/06/2004Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Nos. 42011/42046.
08/27/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. These are consolidated appeals from a judgment of conviction pursuant to a jury verdict. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." fn10[When reviewing this appeal, this court relied on the trial transcripts filed in Docket No. 42067, a direct appeal brought by one of appellant's co-defendants.] SNP04D-RR/WM/MD. Nos. 42011/42046. 04-15631
09/22/2004RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 04-16252
09/22/2004Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/06/2004RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 24, 2004. 04-16252