judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WORMLEY (NERRON) VS. STATE

Case Information: 42042
Short Caption:WORMLEY (NERRON) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 48047
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C184756Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/28/2005How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/16/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/16/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 03-15484
10/20/2003Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 03-17476
10/20/2003Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 11/04/02; 11/13/02; 01/15/03; 03/05/03; 03/26/03; 06/25/03; 07/01/03; 07/02/03; 07/03/03; 07/07/03; 07/08/03; 07/09/03; 07/10/03; and 08/20/03. To Court Reporter: Kristine Cornelius; Janie Olsen; and Dick Kangas. 03-17477
10/20/2003MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 03-17479
10/22/2003Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed October 20, 2003. The clerk shall file the docketing statement received on October 20, 2003. 03-17540
10/22/2003Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 03-17489
11/19/2003TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 07/02/03; 07/03/03; 07/07/03; 07/08/03; 07/09/03. Court Reporter: Kris Cornelius. Proceedings: 07/10/03. Court Reporter: Janie Olsen. 03-19269
03/01/2004MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. From court reporter Janice Liston. 04-03853
03/08/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Extending Time to file Transcripts, Opening Brief and Appendix. Court recorder Janice R. Liston has moved for an extension of time to prepare and file the requested transcripts for this appeal. Cause appearing, we grant the motion. Ms. Liston shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve transcripts for proceedings conducted on November 4, 2002, November 13, 2002, January 15, 2003, March 5, 2003, March 26, 2003, June 25, 2003, July 1, 2003, and August 20, 2003. To date, appellant has failed to file the opening brief and appendix. Because an extension of time has been granted to prepare and file the transcripts for this appeal, appellant shall have 60 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 04-04391
04/09/2004TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 11/4/02; 11/13/02; 01/15/03; 03/05/03; 03/26/03; 06/25/03; 08/20/03; and 07/01/03. Court Reporter: Kris Cornelius. 04-06656
06/15/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order. to file Opening Brief and Appendix. On March 8, 2004, this court entered an order extending the time for the filing of the opening brief and appendix until May 7, 2004. To date, appellant has failed to file these documents. Appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Failure to comply timely with this order may result in the imposition of sanctions. 04-10963
06/28/2004MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Application for Extension of Time. 04-11828
08/12/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order. to file Opening Brief and Denying Request to Remove Counsel and Appoint Alternate Counsel. Appellant's counsel has moved for an extension of time until July 21, 2004, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Because the opening brief was not received within the requested time period we deny the motion. Appellant's counsel shall file and serve the opening brief and appendix within 10 days from the date of this order. Failure to comply with this order may result in the imposition of sanctions. Appellant has submitted a proper person document requesting the removal of his counsel and the appointment of alternate counsel. Appellant has neither sought nor been granted leave to file documents in proper person. See NRAP 46(b). Nevertheless, because we address this motion on its merits, we direct the clerk to file the motion received on July 20, 2004. While we note that the opening brief is now overdue, this alone does not constitute good cause for the removal of appellant's counsel at this time. Accordingly, no good cause having been demonstrated, we deny appellant's motion to remove counsel and appoint alternate counsel. Because appellant is represented by counsel in this appeal, we decline to grant him permission to file additional documents in proper person. Appellant shall proceed by and through his counsel in the prosecution of this appeal and address all concerns relating to this appeal to his counsel of record. 04-14574
08/12/2004Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Letter dated July 7, 2004 requesting Court to remove current counsel and appoint alternate counsel. 04-13194
09/10/2004MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 04-16666
10/06/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. for Extension of time to file Opening Brief. We caution counsel for appellant that any further failures to comply with the Nevada Rules of Appellate procedure or this court's orders may result in the imposition of sanctions. We direct the clerk of this court to file the opening brief and appendix received on September 10, 2004. Respondent shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the answering brief. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a). 04-18443
10/06/2004BriefFiled Opening Brief. 04-16667
10/06/2004AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 04-16668
11/01/2004BriefFiled Answering Brief. 04-20098
11/19/2004MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: December 17, 2004. 04-21385
12/27/2004Case Status Update Briefing Completed. No reply brief filed.
02/28/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 05-03842
02/28/2005Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
04/25/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP05-WM/MD/RP 05-08052
05/20/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 05-08140
05/20/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/01/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 23, 2005. 05-08140