judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HUNT VS. STATE, WELFARE DIVISION

Case Information: 42036
Short Caption:HUNT VS. STATE, WELFARE DIVISIONCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - R044632Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/02/2004How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/16/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee due. 01/06/05 Order Dismissing Appeal-fn4: on September 19, 2003, this court received a letter from appellant with an attached order form the district court granting appellant in forma pauperis status. Accordingly, no filing fee is due.
09/16/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 03-15439
09/16/2003Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
09/24/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due in District Court Case No. R044632: 120 days. fn2[See NRAP 11(a)(2) (providing that the complete record shall contain each and every paper, pleading and other document filed, or submitted for filing, in the district court, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings.)] The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court. 03-16003
01/02/2004Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 04-00077
01/02/2004Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
01/06/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." fn4[Although appellant was not granted leave to file papers in proper person, see NRAP 46(b), we have considered the proper person documents received from him. On September 19, 2003, this court received a letter from appellant with an attached order form the district court granting appellant in forma pauperis status. Accordingly, no filing fee is due.] NNP05-WM/MD/RP 05-00329
02/01/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 05-01024
02/01/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/04/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 4, 2005. 05-01024