judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CONTI VS. SMITH

Case Information: 42030
Short Caption:CONTI VS. SMITHCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A442395Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/12/2003Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Jones Vargas--check no. 45784.
09/12/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 03-15303
09/17/2003Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Modification of Caption. Parties are advised to notify this office in writing within 10 days if the caption as modified does not accurately reflect the status of the parties.
10/01/2003Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 03-16342
10/01/2003Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 03-16344
10/17/2003Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Supplement to Docketing Statement. 03-17305
01/20/2004MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 04-01110
01/27/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Voluntary Dismissal. Cause appearing, appellants' motion for a voluntary dismissal of this appeal is granted. "This appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). fn1[Because any request for relief regarding the bond for costs on appeal is properly sought in the district court, appellants' request for return of the security filed pursuant to NRAP 7 is denied.] NNP/CLK 04-01691
01/27/2004Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.