Case Information: 91-CF-0902 | |||
Short Caption: | LANCELOT LAWRENCE V. UNITED STATES | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Felony - Weapons Related |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | F5850-90 | Filed Date: | 07/30/1991 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 07/30/1991 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 02/10/1992 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 04/22/1992 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 09/01/1992 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 10/16/1992 |
Party Information | ||||||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | |||||||
Appellant | Lancelot Lawrence | N |
| |||||||||
Appellee | United States | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | LAWRENCE, LANCELOT AKA PETER SAM UNITED STATES | |||
01/01/1902 | RAMOS-ORD 5/14/91 (PROC. 5/14/91) JONES, PROCEED. OF 5/24/91, ORDERED 10/25/91 | |||
07/30/1991 | NOTICE OF APPEAL | |||
08/19/1991 | APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JANELL M. WOLFE, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
08/23/1991 | APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT PMB PANEL SCDATE 082991 SCHPRD DSA | |||
09/19/1991 | RECORD ON APPEAL AJ PANEL SCDATE 093091 SCHPRD R | |||
11/07/1991 | MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF CRT RPTR SIMMS FOR EXT. OF TM TO FL TRIAL PROC. TO 12/10/91. PR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
11/07/1991 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (26 PGS. -- BOSTON) (7/15/91 PROC.) PR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
11/14/1991 | ORDER DENY CT RPTR SIMMS MOTION AS UNTIMELY FILED. PR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
12/12/1991 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (207 PGS. - SIMMS) (5/22/91 PROC.) PR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
02/10/1992 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (87-PGS/JONES 5/24/91) AJ PANEL SCDATE 122492 SCHPRD RT | |||
02/10/1992 | RECORD COMPLETED | |||
03/03/1992 | RECEIVED FROM APLT COPIES OF LETTERS SENT TO APLT COUNSEL & FROM SUPERIOR CRT PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
03/16/1992 | APPELLANT'S BRIEF | |||
04/10/1992 | RECEIVED ltr from dept. of justice re correspon- dence between aplt and aple (aplt ltr's attached) | |||
04/22/1992 | APPELLEE'S BRIEF | |||
04/22/1992 | BRIEFS COMPLETED | |||
05/18/1992 | FINAL SCREENING - SUMMARY CALENDAR II | |||
05/19/1992 | NOTICE SENT SUMMARY II - REQUEST TO PRESENT ORAL ARGUMENT, 10 DAYS TO RESPOND. | |||
09/01/1992 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
09/01/1992 | SUBMITTED (ST/MK/NW) | |||
09/23/1992 | AFFIRMED MOJ (ST NW MK) | |||
10/16/1992 | MANDATE ISSUED |