judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KIMOTHY J. WISE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 91-CF-0905
Short Caption:KIMOTHY J. WISE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Lead:91-CF-0905Consolidated: 92-CF-0028
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F10356-89Filed Date:07/26/1991

Opening Event Date:07/26/1991Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/03/1992Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/05/1994
Argued/Submitted:10/12/1994
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/08/1994

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantKimothy J. Wise N
Lois R. GoodmanYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN
Chrisellen R. KolbYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WISE, KIMOTHY J. UNITED STATES
01/01/1902FOR RT FOR RT
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 1/30/92 ORD; 91-905 & 92-28 NOTE - 01 ARE CONS. FO, APPT OF NOTE - 02 RONALD GOODBREAD ESQ IS HEREBY NOTE - 02 VACATED AND LOIS R. GOODMAN NOTE - 03 ESQ IS APPT TO REP APLT ON NOTE - 03 APPEAL. DSA IN 92-28 IS TO NOTE - 04 BE FILED IN 10. NOTE - 04 NOTE - 05 CONS. 92-28 NOTE - 05
01/01/1906 GOODBREADR VACATED 1/30/92
07/26/1991NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/19/1991APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) RONALD A. GOODBREAD, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/03/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS PMB PANEL SCDATE 082991 SCHPRD DSA
09/03/1991RECEIVED DSA PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/18/1991RECORD ON APPEAL PR PANEL SCDATE 092591 SCHPRD R
09/24/1991ORDER GR MO OF APLT LV TO FL DSA, DSA FILED. AD PANELRBH SCDATE 091991 SCHPRD K
10/24/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(75 PGS. TOTAL -- SCHNEIDER) (5/7/91; 5/29/91; 6/27/91 & 6/19/91 PROCEEDINGS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/24/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (92 PGS. -- SALAZAR) RJG PANEL SCDATE 102791 SCHPRD RT
11/07/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (227 PGS. -- HAWKINS) (6/17-19/91 PROCEEDINGS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/30/1992APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) LOIS R. GOODMAN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/30/1992ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 1-4. AC PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/14/1992SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (47 PGS. - TANNER) (10/22/91 PROC.) PR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/21/1992APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT IN 92-28 PR PANEL SCDATE 021392 SCHPRD DSA
03/03/1992RECORD ON APPEAL PMB PANEL SCDATE 030292 SCHPRD R
03/03/1992RECORD COMPLETED
03/26/1992ORDER Appellant shall within 10 days from the date of this order advise this court whether any additional record is required for this appeal. Failure to respond within 10 days will result in the issuance of a briefing order.
04/13/1992The brief of appellant shall be filed no later than May 27, 1992, the brief of appellee shall be filed no later than July 1, 1992, and the reply brief of appellant, if any, shall be filed no later than July 20, 1992; this case shall be placed on the calendar of September 1992. As these dates have been set to enable the court to schedule this case on this calendar, any requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only in extraordinary circumstances. (By JAC)
06/18/1992APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION to remove case from calendar
06/26/1992STATEMENT of appellant to the court concerning efforts to obtain the transcripts.
07/16/1992ORDER - Appellant motion to take case of the calendar granted to the extent that the brief of appellant shall be filed within 40 days after the complete transcript has been filed with this court. It is FURTHER ORDERED that this court's advanced briefing order of April 13, 1992 is hereby vacated. (By RO)
08/04/1992SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (ord. judge burnett dtd 7/23/92 & ord by judge burnett dtd 7/28/92)
09/28/1992SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5 (10 pgs. -- Tape) (5/7/91 proceedings).
10/29/1992SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (9 pgs--tape) PROC. 6/27/91
12/03/1993ORDER that the brief of appellant shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and the brief of appellee shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. Any request for an extension of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (by: WHN)
01/04/1994APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until February 4, 1994.
02/28/1994ORD DENY APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF (in no. 91-CF-905). F/O that counsel for appellant in no. 91-CF-905 shall, within 15 days from the date of this order, file the brief, accompanied by a motion for leave to file the brief out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the brief or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply may result in counsel's appointment being vacated. (by: WHN)
03/31/1994APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL APRIL 4, 1994.
04/05/1994RECEIVED appellant's brief.
04/20/1994ORD GRANT APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF and the lodged brief is filed. F/O that the brief of appellee shall be filed on or before May 5, 1994. (by:WHN)
04/20/1994APPELLANT'S BRIEF
05/05/1994APPELLEE'S BRIEF
05/05/1994BRIEFS COMPLETED
05/16/1994FINAL SCREENING - REGULAR CALENDAR
10/12/1994FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
10/12/1994ARGUED (WG,TE,FA) Lois R. Goodman, Esquire, for appellant. Chrisellen R. Roid, Esquire, for appellee.
10/17/1994AFFIRMED MOJ (WG,TE,FA)
11/08/1994MANDATE ISSUED