judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-8016
B-8016
10/01/1978
Application for Writ of Error
LEONARD AND HARRAL PACKING COMPANY
RANDALL HAHN, SEARS, ROEBUCK AND COMPANY AND KELLY-SPRINGFIELD TIRE COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/16/1979Response to PetitionRespondent
05/22/1979Motion for RehearingPetitioner
12/04/1978Reply to ResponsePetitioner
11/16/1978Response to PetitionRespondent
11/01/1978Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/16/1979Response to Petition
06/01/1979Response to Motion filed
05/30/1979Response to Motion filed
05/22/1979Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/04/1978Miscellaneous MotionDismissed
12/04/1978Reply to Response
11/16/1978Response to Petition
11/01/1978Application for Writ of Error - Filed
10/01/1978Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Sears, Roebuck and Company and Kelly-Springfield Tire CompanyRespondent
Leonard and Harral Packing CompanyPetitioner
Randall HahnRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information