judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DUARTE (FRANCISCO) VS. STATE

Case Information: 43979
Short Caption:DUARTE (FRANCISCO) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C200291Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/21/2004Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/21/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) 04-17503
10/01/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Appellant filed his notice of appeal in proper person. Based upon the documents submitted in this appeal, it appears that appellant was represented by Richard A. Schonfeld during the lower court proceedings. Schonfeld shall have 20 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. 04-18224
10/12/2004MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 04-18907
10/12/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Certified copy filed in district court on October 7, 2004. 04-18908
11/05/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Briefing Schedule. Order Reinstating Briefing. We conclude that we have jurisdiction over this appeal. Counsel for appellant shall have forty (40) days from the date of this order within which to file a fast track statement and appendix. Thereafter, this appeal shall proceed in accordance with the provisions of NRAP 3C. 04-20405
12/07/2004Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 04-22267
12/07/2004AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 04-22268
12/29/2004Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 04-23684
12/29/2004AppendixFiled Appendix. Respondent's Appendix. 04-23685
02/15/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP05-RR/MG/JH 05-02943
03/15/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 05-03309
03/15/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/23/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 17, 2005. 05-03309