Case Information: 89-BG-0823 | |||
Short Caption: | IN RE: RAYMOND B. THOMPSON | Classification: | Bar Governance - Bar - Disciplinary |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | Filed Date: | 03/17/1988 | |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 03/17/1988 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | ||
Briefs Completed: | |||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: |
Party Information | |||||||||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||||||||
Petitioner | Bar Counsel | N |
| ||||||||||||
Petitioner | Board on Professional Responsibility | N |
| ||||||||||||
Respondent | Raymond B. Thompson | N | Pro Se | N |
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | THOMPSON, RAYMOND B. IN THE MATTER OF | |||
01/01/1903 | NOTE - 01 3/13/90 ORD: GRANTG RESP'S MO NOTE - 01 FOR LV TO FILE RESPONSE; CLK NOTE - 02 TO FILE LODGED RESPONSE; BRIEF NOTE - 02 OF RESP DUE BY 4/17/90; NFX. | |||
01/01/1905 | TRDATE- 90/09/18 ACTION - MEMO ATTY 1 - MUNDYR FOR - RESPONDENT ATTY 2 - MCCLENDONS FOR - PETITIONER | |||
03/17/1988 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
03/17/1988 | PETITION INSTITUTING FORMAL DISC. PROCEEDINGS (BDN333-87) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
07/27/1989 | REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF BOARD ON PROF. RESP. RECOMMENDING DISBARMENT PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
08/24/1989 | MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE EXCEPTIONS PB PANEL SCDATE 082189 SCHPRD RSE | |||
08/28/1989 | ORDER GRANT RESP MO TO EXT TM TO FL EXCEPTIONS TO 9/11/89, OR PRO- CEED WITHOUT EXCEPTIONS. MEH PANELRO SCDATE 081689 SCHPRD RSE | |||
09/12/1989 | RESPONDENT'S EXCEPTIONS PB PANEL SCDATE 091189 SCHPRD RSE | |||
09/13/1989 | ORDER RESPONDENTS BRIEF SHALL BE FILED W/IN 40 DAYS & BRF OF BAR COUNSEL 30 DAYS AFTER. PB PANEL SCDATE 091289 SCHPRD T | |||
02/06/1990 | ORDER RESP TO SHOW CAUSE IN 10 DAYS WHY CASE SHD NOT BE SUBMITTED ON REPT & REC ALONE (NO BRF). PANELBE SCDATE 102389 SCHPRD BR | |||
02/20/1990 | MEMORANDUM 2/6 ORD RETURNED ATTEMPTED - NOT KNOWN; RESENT 2/20 - RESP MAY ANSWER BY 3/2/90. CWC PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
03/07/1990 | MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF RESPONDENT FOR LV TO FILE RESPONSE TO ORDER. CWC PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
03/07/1990 | RECEIVED RESPONDENT'S RESPONSE TO 2/6/90 ORDER. CWC PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
03/13/1990 | ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-02 CWC PANELRO SCDATE 031990 SCHPRD OPE | |||
03/13/1990 | RESPONDENT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO 2/6/90 ORD TO SHOW CAUSE. CWC PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
04/17/1990 | RESPONDENT'S BRIEF CWC PANEL SCDATE 041790 SCHPRD BR | |||
05/24/1990 | PETITIONER'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JUNE 8, 1990. CWC PANEL SCDATE 051790 SCHPRD BPE | |||
06/04/1990 | ORDER GRANTG BAR COUNSEL'S MO TO EXTEND TM TO FILE BRIEF TO 6/8/90. CWC PANELRBH SCDATE 060190 SCHPRD CHECK | |||
06/07/1990 | PETITIONER'S BRIEF (BAR COUNSEL) CWC PANEL SCDATE 060890 SCHPRD BPE | |||
07/23/1990 | PETITIONER'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
08/10/1990 | LETTER GRANTING RESPONDENT'S REQUEST TO PRESENT ORAL ARGUMENT. CWC PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
09/18/1990 | MEMORANDUM ARGUED THIS DATE BEFORE JUDGES ST FA WA. CWC PANEL SCDATE 091890 SCHPRD CSUM | |||
12/14/1990 | DISBARMENT RESP DISBARRED FROM PRACTICE OF LAW IN D.C. DAS PANELSTFAWG SCDATE 091890 SCHPRD RDEC | |||
12/14/1990 | DISP NO - 01 DISP - DBAR METH -OPN JUDGE -PC CITE 583 A.2d 1006 | |||
12/14/1990 | OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - PC PAGE # - 3754 | |||
01/26/2001 | LETTER from Bar Counsel with a certified copy of an order of the Court of Appeals of Maryland suspending respondent. | |||
04/12/2001 | LETTER from the Office of Bar Counsel with a certified copy of an order of the Court of Appeals of Maryland revoking the license of respondent. |