judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BELL VS. BELL

Case Information: 43970
Short Caption:BELL VS. BELLCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D311350Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/24/2004 / Worrell, CarolynSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/20/2004Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Jolley Urga Wirth Woodbury & Standish--check no. 535236.
09/20/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 04-17373
09/24/2004Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/07/2004Other Returned Unfiled Document.
10/13/2004Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 04-18961
11/18/2004Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 04-21308
01/06/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties have agreed to a settlement. Appellant shall have 30 days to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. Failure to comply with this order in a timely manner may result in the dismissal of this appeal as abandoned. 05-00308
03/18/2005MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. (Stipulation to Dismiss attached). 05-05401
03/31/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Voluntary Dismissal. Pursuant to the motion for voluntary dismissal filed on March 18, 2005, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK 05-06307
03/31/2005Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.