judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TYDINGS, JOSEPH D. TYDINGS, TERRY H.

Case Information: 87-FM-1492
Short Caption:TYDINGS, JOSEPH D. TYDINGS, TERRY H.Classification:Appeals - Family - Domestic Relations
Lead: 87-FM-1491 Consolidated:87-FM-1492
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:D3175-85Filed Date:12/07/1987

Opening Event Date:12/07/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/13/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/17/1989
Argued/Submitted:09/26/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/03/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Mark S. LondonYY
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Peter R. Sherman YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Mark S. Carlin NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901TYDINGS, JOSEPH D. TYDINGS, TERRY H.
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 SEE 8701491, 8701490 & 8701493 NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 CON 87-1491 NOTE - 02 NOTE - 03 3/14/88 ORD: REMOVING 87-1490 NOTE - 03 & 87-1493 FROM 3/29/88 SETT NOTE - 04 CNFERENCE CALENDAR & DSMISSING NOTE - 04 THEM; 87-1491 & 87-1492 TO NOTE - 05 REMAIN ON 3/29/88 SETT CONF NOTE - 05 CALENDAR; GRNTG APLT'S MO TO NOTE - 06 EXT TM TO FILE DESIGNATION OF NOTE - 06 RECORD; CLK TO FILE LODGED NOTE - 07 DESIGNATION OF RECORD. NOTE - 07 NOTE - 08 3/27/91 ORD: DENIED APLE'S REQ NOTE - 08 FOR ATTY FEES, F/O GRTD APLE'S NOTE - 09 REQ FOR COSTS IN PART IN THE NOTE - 09 AMOUNT OF $424, F/O DENIED REQ NOTE - 10 OF APLE FOR COSTS PERTAINING NOTE - 10 TO TRANSCRIPT W/O PREJ TO ITS NOTE - 11 RENEWAL IN THE TRIAL COURT. NOTE - 11
01/01/1905TRDATE- 89/09/26 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - LONDONM FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - SHERMANP FOR - APPELLEE
12/07/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
12/31/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/31/1987$50.00 DOCKETING FEE GREG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/15/1988$5 PAID TO DC TREASURER JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/05/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE DR & SRTTO 2/15/88 PB PANEL SCDATE 121787 SCHPRD DR
02/11/1988ORDER SS CONSOLIDATING 87-1490, 87-1491, 87-1492 & 87-1493 FOR ALL PURPOSES. FVH PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/17/1988RECEIVED DESIGNATION OF RECORD JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/22/1988COUNTER DESIGNATION OF RECORD RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/24/1988MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT'S TO SEVER, DISMISS & CONSOLIDATE (NO OPPO) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/24/1988STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) OF APPELLEE PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/14/1988DESIGNATION OF RECORD (DR CONTAINS TRANSCRIPT INFO) CWC PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/14/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 03-07 CWC PANELPY SCDATE 021788 SCHPRD OPE
03/24/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S SETTLEMENT CONF. MEMORANDUM RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/16/1988ORDER APLT TO CAUSE RECORD TO BE PREPARED & TRNSMTD FORTHWITH; APLT BR DUE 40 DAYS THEREAFT. PANELPY SCDATE 032988 SCHPRD SCNF
09/12/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL IN 87-1491 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/13/1988APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 092088 SCHPRD OPA
10/13/1988FiledRecord Completed
10/13/1988RECORD ON APPEAL (BROWN ENVELOPE W/EXHIBITS) GT PANEL SCDATE 061688 SCHPRD R
10/17/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/20/1988ORDER DENY MO OF APLE TO DISMISS; BRF OF APLT DUE BY 11/28/88 DAS PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/28/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF AND LIST AD PANEL SCDATE 112888 SCHPRD BA
12/06/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JANUARY 17TH (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 010389 SCHPRD BE
12/06/1988RECEIVED APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF (SHORT PAPER) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/23/1988ORDER GRT APLE MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 1/17/89. PB PANELRO SCDATE 121588 SCHPRD V
01/17/1989FiledBriefing Completed
01/17/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 011789 SCHPRD BE
01/24/1989APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF TO 3-1-89 AD (NO OPPO) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/23/1989APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF OF APPELLANT TO 3/15/89 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/01/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL REPLY BRF TO 3/15/89. PANELRBH SCDATE 020389 SCHPRD CHECK
03/15/1989APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 031589 SCHPRD RBA
09/26/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/26/1989ARGUED PANELTESCFA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/13/1989AFFIRMED JUDGMENT AF TRIAL COURT JDGMT PANELTESCFA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/13/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -FA CITE 567 A.2d 886
12/13/1989OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - FA PAGE # - 3125 OPINION TYPE C JUDGE - SW PAGE # - 0000
01/03/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/16/1990MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLE FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COST AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/29/1990APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION TO MMP FILED 1-16-90 AD PANEL SCDATE 012990 SCHPRD OPA
02/15/1990RECEIVED APPELLEE'S REPLY TO APLT'S OPPO TO MOTION FOR ATTYS FEES & COSTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/27/1991ORDER (SEE NOTES 8 THRU 11) JB PANELTESCFA SCDATE 030691 SCHPRD VS